blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4345067

EP4345067 - POSITIVE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR RECHARGEABLE LITHIUM BATTERIES, PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF, AND RECHARGEABLE LITHIUM BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2024Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
01.03.2024The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
01.03.2024Request for examination filedpublished on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
150-20, Gongse-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR
For all designated states
Board of Regents, The University of Texas System
201 West 7th Street
Austin, TX 78701 / US
[2024/14]
Inventor(s)01 / MANTHIRAM, Arumugam
Austin, 78701 / US
02 / KIM, Youngjin
Austin, 78701 / US
03 / KIM, Hanseul
Austin, 78759 / US
04 / SEONG, Wonmo
17084 Yongin-si / KR
05 / KONG, Youngsun
17084 Yongin-si / KR
 [2024/14]
Representative(s)Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2024/14]
Application number, filing date23153759.827.01.2023
[2024/14]
Priority number, dateUS20221795820330.09.2022         Original published format: US202217958203
[2024/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4345067
Date:03.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2023
ClassificationIPC:C01G53/04, C01G53/00, H01M4/36, H01M4/525
[2024/14]
CPC:
C01G53/42 (EP,US); H01M4/366 (EP,US); C01G53/04 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP,US); H01M10/0525 (EP); H01M4/0471 (EP);
H01M4/131 (EP); H01M4/1391 (EP); H01M4/364 (EP);
H01M4/483 (US); H01M4/485 (EP); H01M4/505 (EP);
H01M4/525 (EP,US); H01M4/5825 (EP,US); H01M4/62 (EP);
C01P2002/52 (EP); C01P2002/70 (US); C01P2004/03 (US);
C01P2004/84 (EP); C01P2006/80 (EP); H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,US); Y02E60/10 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/14]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POSITIVES AKTIVMATERIAL FÜR WIEDERAUFLADBARE LITHIUMBATTERIEN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND WIEDERAUFLADBARE LITHIUMBATTERIEN[2024/14]
English:POSITIVE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR RECHARGEABLE LITHIUM BATTERIES, PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF, AND RECHARGEABLE LITHIUM BATTERIES[2024/14]
French:MATÉRIAU ACTIF POSITIF POUR BATTERIES AU LITHIUM RECHARGEABLES, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET BATTERIES AU LITHIUM RECHARGEABLES[2024/14]
Examination procedure27.01.2023Examination requested  [2024/14]
19.02.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US2020136132  (HONG SUKGI [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0059] - [0062] - [0 75] - [0076]; example -; claim - *;
 [XI]CN113233519  (ZHEJIANG POWER NEW ENERGY CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6,15 * abstract * [I] 3,7-14;
 [XI]CN113851633  (UNIV CENTRAL SOUTH) [X] 1,4,6,9,11,13,15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006]; example -; claim - * [I] 2,3,5,7,8,10,12,14;
 [A]EP4047691  (ECOPRO BM CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* example -; claim - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.