blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4207552

EP4207552 - FAST CHARGING METHOD AND SYSTEM, TERMINAL, AND CHARGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.01.2024
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.06.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2023/27]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Xujun
Shenzhen / CN
02 / LIU, Ce
Shenzhen / CN
03 / LIU, Yanding
Shenzhen / CN
04 / MA, Jinbo
Shenzhen / CN
05 / WANG, Pinghua
Shenzhen / CN
 [2023/27]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2023/27]
Application number, filing date23157715.624.03.2017
[2023/27]
Priority number, dateCN20161021818408.04.2016         Original published format: CN201610218184
[2023/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4207552
Date:05.07.2023
Language:EN
[2023/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2023
ClassificationIPC:H02J7/00
[2023/27]
CPC:
H02J7/007184 (EP,US); H02J7/00712 (KR,US); H02J7/00 (US);
G01R31/3648 (US); H01M10/44 (KR); H02J7/00302 (KR);
H02J7/0031 (KR); H02J7/0042 (US); H02J7/0047 (KR);
H01M10/4257 (US); H02J2207/20 (KR); H02J7/00034 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/27]
TitleGerman:SCHNELLLADEVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM, ENDGERÄT UND LADEGERÄT[2023/27]
English:FAST CHARGING METHOD AND SYSTEM, TERMINAL, AND CHARGER[2023/27]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CHARGE RAPIDE, TERMINAL ET CHARGEUR[2023/27]
Examination procedure21.02.2023Examination requested  [2023/27]
05.01.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.01.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.01.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.07.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP17778601.9  / EP3435511
EP19211984.0  / EP3654487
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
30.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009174366  (AHMAD BAHER A [US], et al);
 [A]US2014300321  (KIM CHULKWI [KR], et al);
 [I]WO2015113349  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM [CN]);
 [A]WO2015113333  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM [CN]);
 [A]EP2942853  (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD [CN]);
 [P]EP3101758  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]);
 [P]EP3101752  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.