blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4219667

EP4219667 - USE OF QUATERNISED ALKYLAMINE AS ADDITIVES IN FUELS AND LUBRICANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  30.06.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2024Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[2023/31]
Inventor(s)01 / HANSCH, Markus
67346 Speyer / DE
02 / BÖHNKE, Harald
68167 Mannheim / DE
03 / VÖLKEL, Ludwig
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
04 / GRABARSE, Wolfgang
68163 Mannheim / DE
05 / STRITTMATTER, Jan
Shanghai, 200030 / CN
 [2023/31]
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2023/31]Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date23158753.612.12.2012
[2023/31]
Priority number, dateEP2011019303412.12.2011         Original published format: EP 11193034
[2023/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4219667
Date:02.08.2023
Language:DE
[2023/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP4219667
Date:16.08.2023
Language:DE
[2023/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2023
ClassificationIPC:C10M133/02, C10M133/06, C10M133/54, C07C209/20, C07C211/63, C10L1/22, C10L10/04, C10L10/06, // C10N40/25, C10N30/04, C10N70/00
[2023/33]
CPC:
C10M133/06 (EP,KR); C07C209/20 (EP,KR); C07C211/63 (EP,KR);
C10L1/14 (EP,KR); C10L1/2222 (EP); C10L10/06 (EP,KR);
C10L10/18 (EP,KR); C10M133/02 (EP,KR); C10M133/54 (EP,KR);
C10L2270/023 (EP); C10L2270/026 (EP); C10M2215/02 (EP,KR);
C10M2215/04 (EP,KR); C10M2215/042 (EP,KR); C10M2215/26 (EP,KR);
C10N2030/04 (EP,KR); C10N2030/54 (EP,KR); C10N2040/252 (EP,KR);
C10N2040/255 (EP,KR); C10N2070/02 (EP,KR); Y02T10/12 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2023/31]C10M133/02, C10M133/06, C10M133/54, C07C209/20, C07C211/63, C10L1/22, C10L10/04, C10L10/06, C10N40/25, C10N30/04, C10N70/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/13]
Former [2023/31]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG QUATERNISIERTER ALKYLAMINE ALS ADDITIVE IN KRAFT- UND SCHMIERSTOFFEN[2023/31]
English:USE OF QUATERNISED ALKYLAMINE AS ADDITIVES IN FUELS AND LUBRICANTS[2023/31]
French:UTILISATION D'ALKYLAMINES QUATERNISÉES COMME ADDITIFS DANS DES CARBURANTS ET DES LUBRIFIANTS[2023/31]
Examination procedure16.02.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2024Examination requested  [2024/13]
16.02.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12799567.8  / EP2791291
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 10
27.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 11
02.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0189085  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 11-14 * page 4, line 31 - page 8, line 5 * * example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP0293192  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 9-14 * page 1, line 1 - line 21 * * page 1, line 44 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, line 47 - page 4, line 10 * * page 6; compound J * * example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP0345475  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 9,10 * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 38 * * example -; claim - *;
 [A]US4902437  (VARDI JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2006135881  (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 5, line 13 - line 25 * * page 10, line 4 - page 12, line 21 * * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US2008141580  (TACK ROBERT DRYDEN [GB]) [X] 9-14 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059] * * example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP2033945  (INFINEUM INT LTD [GB]) [X] 9-14 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0025] * * example -; claim - *;
 [XI]WO2011095819  (INNOSPEC LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,8-14 * page 9, line 20 - line 35 * * page 14, line 9 - page 15, line 21 * * page 19, line 8 - page 22, line 5 * * example -; claim - *[I] 4-7
by applicantUS4171959
 US4248719
 EP0061895
 US4491455
 WO8701126
 EP0244616
 EP0261957
 EP0307815
 EP0310875
 US4877416
 DE3826608
 EP0356725
 DE3838918
 EP0452328
 EP0476485
 DE4142241
 EP0548617
 WO9318115
 DE4309074
 WO9424231
 EP0639632
 WO9603479
 EP0700985
 WO9703946
 DE19620262
 WO9804656
 WO9929748
 WO0044857
 WO0047698
 DE10102913
 EP1254889
 WO2004035715
 US6743266
 WO2005054314
 WO2006003367
 WO2006135881
 EP2033945
 WO2010132259
    - N. A. PLATEV. P. SHIBAEV, "Comb-Like Polymers. Structure and Properties", J. Poly. Sci. Macromolecular Revs, (19740000), vol. 8, pages 117 - 253
    - CAS , no. 64742-94-5
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.