blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4339230

EP4339230 - MULTILAYER PACKAGING FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  16.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2024Change - applicantpublished on 24.04.2024  [2024/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOSGER Sp. z o.o.
ul. Klobucka 8d/63
02-699 Warszawa / PL
[2024/17]
Former [2024/12]For all designated states
NanoPolymer Ltd.
Oktyabrskaya Str. 16/5
220030 Minsk Belarus / BY
Inventor(s)01 / Patsukevich, Vitaliy Stanislavovich
Minsk / BY
 [2024/12]
Representative(s)Lampart, Jerzy
Kancelaria Patentowa
Ul. Wyzwolenia 1b
42-624 Ossy / PL
[2024/12]
Application number, filing date23168816.919.04.2023
[2024/12]
Priority number, dateBY2022000004807.09.2022         Original published format: BY 20220048
[2024/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4339230
Date:20.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2024
ClassificationIPC:C08J5/18, C08J7/04, C08J7/048, C08J7/06
[2024/12]
CPC:
C08J5/18 (EP); C08J7/0423 (EP); C08J7/048 (EP);
C08J7/06 (EP); C08K3/08 (EP); B82Y30/00 (EP);
C08J2323/06 (EP); C08K2003/0812 (EP); C08K2003/2241 (EP);
C08K2003/265 (EP); C08K5/0033 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
C08K3/22, C08L23/06 (EP);
C08K3/26, C08L23/06 (EP);
C08K3/346, C08L23/06 (EP);
C08K5/098, C08L23/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRSCHICHTIGE VERPACKUNGSFOLIE[2024/12]
English:MULTILAYER PACKAGING FILM[2024/12]
French:FILM D'EMBALLAGE MULTICOUCHE[2024/12]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2001031348  (JUD WILFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] , [0034]; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE10221143  (HUHTAMAKI RONSBERG DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0019] , [0021] *;
 [A]US2006251840  (HUETT DETLEF [US], et al) [A] 1-5* sentences 3,25,44,; claim 1 *
by applicantRU2245792
 WO2006027033
 WO2011027225
 DE20021021143
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.