blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4234132

EP4234132 - METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING MOLDS AND CORES LAYER BY LAYER BY MEANS OF A BINDER CONTAINING WATER GLASS, AND A BINDER CONTAINING WATER GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.07.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2024Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASK Chemicals GmbH
Reisholzstrasse 16-18
40721 Hilden / DE
[2023/35]
Inventor(s)01 / DETERS, Heinz
40470 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / ZUPAN, Henning
42289 Wuppertal / DE
 [2023/35]
Representative(s)Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Hamburg)
Schellerdamm 19
21079 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2023/35]Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Schellerdamm 19
21079 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date23175732.911.12.2015
[2023/35]
Priority number, dateDE20141011857712.12.2014         Original published format: DE102014118577
[2023/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4234132
Date:30.08.2023
Language:DE
[2023/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP4234132
Date:20.03.2024
Language:DE
[2024/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2024
ClassificationIPC:B29C67/00, B22F7/02, B22C1/18
[2024/12]
CPC:
B22C1/188 (EP,KR,RU,US); B29C33/3807 (KR,RU); B33Y70/00 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B22C9/02 (EP,KR,RU,US); B22C9/10 (EP,KR,US); B22F7/02 (RU);
B28B1/001 (US); B28B11/241 (US); B29C33/448 (KR);
B29C33/54 (KR); B29C64/153 (RU); B29C64/165 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B32B18/00 (EP,US); B33Y10/00 (RU,US); B33Y50/02 (RU,US);
B33Y80/00 (RU,US); C04B35/14 (EP,KR,RU,US); C04B35/6303 (EP,RU,US);
C04B35/6313 (EP,KR,US); C04B35/6316 (EP,KR,US); C09J1/02 (CN,KR);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US); C04B2235/3409 (EP,US); C04B2235/3427 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5427 (EP,US); C04B2235/5436 (EP,US); C04B2235/6026 (EP,US);
C04B2235/667 (EP,US); C04B2237/704 (EP,US); Y02P10/25 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2023/35]B22F7/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/35]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SCHICHTWEISEN AUFBAU VON FORMEN UND KERNEN MIT EINEM WASSERGLASHALTIGEN BINDEMITTEL UND EIN WASSERGLASHALTIGES BINDEMITTEL[2023/35]
English:METHOD FOR CONSTRUCTING MOLDS AND CORES LAYER BY LAYER BY MEANS OF A BINDER CONTAINING WATER GLASS, AND A BINDER CONTAINING WATER GLASS[2023/35]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FORMATION COUCHE PAR COUCHE DE MOULES ET DE NOYAUX AVEC UN LIANT CONTENANT DU VERRE SOLUBLE ET LIANT CONTENANT DU VERRE SOLUBLE[2023/35]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15830761.1  / EP3230046
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
26.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 08
18.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US6139619  (ZARETSKIY LEONID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * Sp. 4, Z .12 - Sp. 5, Z. 23; Sp. 7, Z. 21f mit Sp. 28: "Table 22", Z. 59-64 *;
 [A]US2003133822  (HARRYSON URBAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004056378  (BREDT JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [AD]DE102011053205  (PROMETAL RCT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * [0006], [0015]-[0021], [0052]f, [0060]f, [0069]-[0074] *
by applicantWO2008101668
 DE102007045649
 DE102007051850
 US2010173767
 EP1802409
 WO2012175072
 WO2013017134
 DE102011053205
 DE102012020510
 DE102012020511
 DE102012020509
    - CAS, no. 69012-64-12
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.