blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4283983

EP4283983 - READING ARRANGEMENT FOR AN IMAGE SENSOR, IMAGE SENSOR SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR READING AN IMAGE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  27.10.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2024Publication of search reportpublished on 21.02.2024  [2024/08]
19.01.2024Change - classificationpublished on 21.02.2024  [2024/08]
19.01.2024Change - classificationpublished on 21.02.2024  [2024/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastraße 27c
80686 München / DE
[2023/48]
Inventor(s)01 / DÖGE, Jens
01069 Dresden / DE
 [2023/48]
Representative(s)Burger, Markus, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstraße 2
81373 München / DE
[2023/48]
Application number, filing date23187782.018.01.2018
[2023/48]
Priority number, dateEP2017015207718.01.2017         Original published format: EP 17152077
EP2017015229919.01.2017         Original published format: EP 17152299
[2023/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4283983
Date:29.11.2023
Language:DE
[2023/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP4283983
Date:21.02.2024
Language:DE
[2024/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2024
ClassificationIPC:H04N25/445, H04N25/75, H04N25/78
[2024/08]
CPC:
H04N25/445 (EP,KR); H04N25/75 (US); H04N25/78 (EP,KR)
Former IPC [2023/48]H04N5/76
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/48]
TitleGerman:AUSLESEANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN BILDSENSOR, BILDSENSOR-SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSLESEN EINES BILDSENSORS[2023/48]
English:READING ARRANGEMENT FOR AN IMAGE SENSOR, IMAGE SENSOR SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR READING AN IMAGE SENSOR[2023/48]
French:AGENCEMENT DE LECTURE POUR UN CAPTEUR D'IMAGE, SYSTÈME DE CAPTEURS D'IMAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE D'UN CAPTEUR D'IMAGE[2023/48]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP18700438.7  / EP3571836
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
17.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2016092735  (GOVIL ALOK [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0080] - [0096] * * paragraph [0134] *;
 [A]US2016094800  (GOUSEV EVGENI PETROVICH [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract ** paragraphs [0044] , [0 47] , [ 125] *
by applicant   - LEIF LINDGRENJOHAN MELANDERROBERT JOHANSSONB MOLLER, "A multiresolution 100-GOPS 4-Gpixels/s programmable smart vision sensor for multisense imaging", Solid-State Circuits, IEEE Journal, (20050000), vol. 40, no. 6, doi:10.1109/JSSC.2005.848029, pages 1350 - 1359, XP011133188

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2005.848029
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.