blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4295755

EP4295755 - WIRELESS NERVE INTEGRITY MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  24.11.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Formerunknown
Status updated on  01.11.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2024Publication of search reportpublished on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
16.02.2024Change - classificationpublished on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
16.02.2024Change - classificationpublished on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic Xomed, Inc.
6743 Southpoint Drive North
Jacksonville, FL 32216 / US
[2023/52]
Inventor(s)01 / BROWN, Richard L.
Mesa, 85212 / US
02 / POLLOCK, John G.
Peoria, 85383 / US
03 / MCFARLIN, Kevin L.
St. Johns, 32259 / US
04 / SCHULHAUSER, Randal C.
Phoenix, 85048 / US
05 / JUSTIS, Jeff R.
Germantown, 38139 / US
06 / STEVENSON, Tyler S.
Phoenix, 85006 / US
 [2023/52]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[2023/52]
Application number, filing date23195973.505.08.2015
[2023/52]
Priority number, dateUS20141445525808.08.2014         Original published format: US201414455258
US20141445528508.08.2014         Original published format: US201414455285
US20141445531308.08.2014         Original published format: US201414455313
[2023/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4295755
Date:27.12.2023
Language:EN
[2023/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP4295755
Date:20.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2024
ClassificationIPC:A61B5/00, A61B5/389
[2024/12]
CPC:
A61B5/4041 (EP,KR,US); A61B5/6833 (EP,KR,US); A61B1/00004 (EP,US);
A61B1/00016 (EP,US); A61B1/00036 (EP,US); A61B1/2673 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0002 (KR,US); A61B5/0004 (KR,US); A61B5/0008 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0024 (EP,KR,US); A61B5/0084 (KR,US); A61B5/01 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/02055 (EP,KR,US); A61B5/024 (EP,KR,US); A61B5/0816 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/11 (EP,KR,US); A61B5/1107 (EP,KR,US); A61B5/14539 (KR,US);
A61B5/1473 (KR,US); A61B5/296 (EP,KR,US); A61B5/316 (EP,US);
A61B5/389 (EP,US); A61B5/4836 (KR); A61B5/4848 (KR,US);
A61B5/6843 (EP,KR,US); A61B5/6848 (KR,US); A61B5/6852 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/7475 (KR,US); A61M16/04 (KR,US); A61M16/0443 (EP,KR,US);
A61N1/36014 (KR); A61N1/36031 (EP,US); A61N1/36034 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0209 (EP,KR,US); A61B2562/0209 (EP,KR,US); A61M2205/3569 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US); A61M2205/36 (EP,US); A61M2205/502 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP,US); A61M2205/8206 (EP,US); A61M2230/06 (EP,US);
A61M2230/42 (EP,US); A61M2230/50 (EP,US); A61M2230/60 (EP,US);
A61M2230/63 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2023/52]A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/52]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR DRAHTLOSEN NERVENINTEGRITÄTSÜBERWACHUNG[2023/52]
English:WIRELESS NERVE INTEGRITY MONITORING SYSTEM[2023/52]
French:SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE D'INTÉGRITÉ NERVEUSE SANS FIL[2023/52]
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2023/52]
31.10.2023Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2023/52]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15753542.8  / EP3177202
EP20176316.6  / EP3721792
Request for further processing for:10.11.2023Request for further processing filed
10.11.2023Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.11.2023Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
07.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
07.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
07.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
07.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
07.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 08
07.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US6026321  (MIYATA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 5, line 17 - line 29 *;
 [A]US6212427  (HOOVER JAN C [US]) [A] 1,6-12 * column 11, line 3 - line 10 * * page 10, line 53 - line 54 *;
 [A]US2005131288  (TURNER CHRISTOPHER T [US], et al) [A] 1,14* paragraph [0060] *;
 [A]US2007260293  (CARPENTER GREG [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * paragraph [0062] *;
 [A]US2009186577  (ROSS JOHN ANDERSON FERGUS [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0025] - [0031] *;
 [X]WO2013160549  (FIBRUX OY [FI]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 19 - line 21; figure 4b * * page 4, line 35 - line 37; figure 4c * * page 23, line 7 - line 29; figures 5b,5c *;
 [X]US2014180169  (PETERS CHRISTIAAN HENDRIK LEONARD [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0060] , [0061]; figure 2b *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.