blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4339006

EP4339006 - RAILWAY VEHICLE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  16.02.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2024The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
15.03.2024Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2024  [2024/16]
15.03.2024Change - designated statespublished on 17.04.2024  [2024/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALSTOM Holdings
48 rue Albert Dhalenne
93400 Saint-Ouen-sur-Seine / FR
[2024/12]
Inventor(s)01 / HEIDET, Arnaud
90000 BELFORT / FR
02 / JEANBLANC, Patrick
90300 SERMAMAGNY / FR
03 / GIRAUDON, Gilles
90000 BELFORT / FR
 [2024/12]
Representative(s)Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2024/12]
Application number, filing date23198213.319.09.2023
[2024/12]
Priority number, dateFR2022000942419.09.2022         Original published format: FR 2209424
[2024/12]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4339006
Date:20.03.2024
Language:FR
[2024/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2024
ClassificationIPC:B60L3/00, B60L9/00, B60L15/20, B60L15/38, B60L15/42, B61C3/00, B61C9/38, B61C15/14, B61L3/00, B61C3/02, B61C7/04, B61D1/00, B61L15/00
[2024/12]
CPC:
B60L15/38 (EP); B60L15/2045 (EP); B60L15/42 (EP);
B60L3/0023 (EP); B60L9/00 (EP); B61C15/14 (EP);
B61C3/02 (EP); B61C7/04 (EP); B61D1/00 (EP);
B61L15/0058 (EP); B61L15/0072 (EP); B60L2200/26 (EP);
B60L2220/42 (EP); B60L2220/46 (EP); B60L2240/12 (EP);
B60L2240/423 (EP); B60L2240/80 (EP); B60L2260/26 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/16]
Former [2024/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  ME,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHIENENFAHRZEUG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2024/12]
English:RAILWAY VEHICLE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR[2024/12]
French:VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ[2024/12]
Examination procedure12.03.2024Examination requested  [2024/16]
12.03.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP2650186  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-4 * abstract * * column 4 - column 15 *;
 [A]EP2960122  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *;
 [A]US2018361878  (AKIYAMA SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2 - page 8 *;
 [XYI]EP3473485  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,8-10 * abstract * * page 2 - page 8 * [Y] 2-4 [I] 7;
 [A]EP3838652  (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 13 - column 24 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.