blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4307701

EP4307701 - SENSING IMAGES USING MULTIPLE BAND PASS BAYER PATTERN FILTER FOR DISCRIMINATING LIPID AND COLLAGEN TISSUES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.12.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2024Publication of search reportpublished on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
16.02.2024Change - classificationpublished on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
16.02.2024Change - classificationpublished on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc.
1020 Kifer Road
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
[2024/03]
Inventor(s)01 / CULMAN, William Jason
Sunnyvale, 94086 / US
02 / DICARLO, Jeffrey M.
Sunnyvale, 94086 / US
03 / MCDOWALL, Ian E.
Sunnyvale, 94086 / US
 [2024/03]
Representative(s)MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al
Mathys & Squire The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2024/03]
Application number, filing date23212771.201.07.2019
[2024/03]
Priority number, dateUS201862697102P12.07.2018         Original published format: US 201862697102 P
[2024/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4307701
Date:17.01.2024
Language:EN
[2024/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP4307701
Date:20.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2024
ClassificationIPC:H04N25/131, A61B90/00, A61B5/00, A61B1/06, A61B1/313, H04N25/13, A61B1/00, A61B5/145
[2024/12]
CPC:
A61B90/361 (EP); H04N25/131 (EP,CN,US); A61B1/00009 (EP,US);
A61B1/00186 (EP); A61B1/0638 (EP); A61B1/3132 (EP);
A61B34/20 (CN); A61B34/25 (CN,US); A61B34/35 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/0075 (EP); A61B5/0077 (US); A61B5/0084 (EP);
A61B5/4887 (EP,US); A61B5/742 (US); A61B90/30 (US);
G02B5/201 (CN,US); H04N25/134 (EP,CN); H04N25/135 (EP);
A61B1/00149 (EP); A61B1/0016 (EP); A61B2034/2057 (CN);
A61B2034/2065 (CN); A61B2090/371 (EP); A61B2505/05 (EP);
A61B5/14546 (EP); A61B5/14552 (EP); A61B5/1459 (EP);
A61B5/4869 (EP); H04N2209/043 (EP); H04N2209/044 (EP);
H04N2209/045 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2024/03]H04N25/13
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/03]
TitleGerman:BILDERFASSUNG MITTELS BAYER-MUSTERFILTER MIT MEHREREN BANDPÄSSEN ZUR UNTERSCHEIDUNG VON LIPID- UND KOLLAGENGEWEBEN[2024/03]
English:SENSING IMAGES USING MULTIPLE BAND PASS BAYER PATTERN FILTER FOR DISCRIMINATING LIPID AND COLLAGEN TISSUES[2024/03]
French:DÉTECTION D'IMAGES À L'AIDE D'UN FILTRE À MOTIFS BAYER À BANDES MULTIPLES POUR DISTINGUER DES TISSUS LIPIDIQUES ET DE COLLAGÈNE[2024/03]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP19752575.1  / EP3821595
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US5255087  (NAKAMURA KAZUNARI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 6, line 55 - column 9, line 54; figures 1-6 * * column 29, line 16 - column 31, line 18; figures 60-65 * * column 32, line 61 - column 34, line 2; figures 70-72 *;
 [IA]JP2015053979  (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP) [I] 1-7,11-15 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0128]; figures 1-3, 6-8 * [A] 8-10;
 [A]  - RAMI NACHABÉ ET AL, "Diagnosis of breast cancer using diffuse optical spectroscopy from 500 to 1600 nm: comparison of classification methods", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL OPTICS, (20110101), vol. 16, no. 8, doi:10.1117/1.3611010, ISSN 1083-3668, page 087010, XP055029288 [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.3611010
 [A]  - SEKAR SANATHANA KONUGOLU VENKATA ET AL, "Diffuse optical characterization of collagen absorption from 500 to 1700 nm", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL OPTICS, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, vol. 22, no. 1, doi:10.1117/1.JBO.22.1.015006, ISSN 1083-3668, (20170101), page 15006, (20170131), XP060082686 [A] 1-15 * figure 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.JBO.22.1.015006
 [A]  - Cheng-Lun Tsai ET AL, "Near-infrared Absorption Property of Biological Soft Tissue Constituents", Journal of medical and biological engineering, (20010301), pages 7 - 14, URL: https://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/document?repid=rep1&type=pdf&doi=a49d620d50bac2f52592d3b0bf080d8b9dadf182, (20230629), XP093059265 [A] 1-15 * page 8 - page 12; figure 7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.