blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4338662

EP4338662 - PREDICTIVE THERAPY NEUROSTIMULATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  16.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2024Publication of search reportpublished on 17.04.2024  [2024/16]
15.03.2024Change - classificationpublished on 17.04.2024  [2024/16]
15.03.2024Change - classificationpublished on 17.04.2024  [2024/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cala Health, Inc.
1800 Gateway Drive, Suite 300
San Mateo, CA 94404 / US
[2024/12]
Inventor(s)01 / ROSS, Erika Kristine
Burlingame, 94010 / US
02 / SHIN, Sooyoon
Burlingame, 94010 / US
03 / HOUSTON, Brady
Burlingame, 94010 / US
04 / BALBAKY, Sami
Burlingame, 94010 / US
05 / HAMNER, Samuel Richard
Burlingame, 94010 / US
06 / ROSENBLUTH, Kathryn H.
Burlingame, 94010 / US
07 / YU, Jai Y.
Burlingame, 94010 / US
 [2024/12]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
80 Turnmill Street
London EC1M 5QU / GB
[2024/12]
Application number, filing date23215181.126.09.2019
[2024/12]
Priority number, dateUS201862736968P26.09.2018         Original published format: US 201862736968 P
[2024/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4338662
Date:20.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP4338662
Date:17.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2024
ClassificationIPC:A61N1/36, A61N1/18, A61N1/04, A61B5/11, A61B5/24, A61B5/00
[2024/16]
CPC:
A61B5/1101 (EP); A61N1/0456 (EP,US); A61B5/24 (EP);
A61B5/4041 (EP); A61B5/6847 (EP); A61B5/6868 (EP);
A61B5/7207 (EP); A61B5/7257 (EP); A61H1/00 (US);
A61N1/0484 (US); A61N1/36003 (EP,US); A61N1/3603 (EP);
A61N1/36031 (EP,US); A61N1/36034 (US); A61H2201/10 (US);
A61H2201/5007 (US); A61H2201/5058 (US); A61H2201/5084 (US);
A61N1/36025 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2024/12]A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/12]
TitleGerman:NEUROSTIMULATIONSSYSTEME FÜR PRÄDIKTIVE THERAPIE[2024/12]
English:PREDICTIVE THERAPY NEUROSTIMULATION SYSTEMS[2024/12]
French:SYSTÈMES DE NEUROSTIMULATION THÉRAPEUTIQUE PRÉDICTIVE[2024/12]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP19866694.3  / EP3856330
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
08.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2014089549  (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2014336722  (ROCON DE LIMA EDUARDO [ES], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2016198998  (RAHIMI FARIBORZ [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [A]WO2017132067  (CALA HEALTH INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2018028170  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2018264263  (ROSENBLUTH KATHRYN H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS9452287
 WO2016201366
 WO2017023864
 WO2017053847
 WO2017132067
 US9802041
 WO2018009680
 WO2018039458
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.