blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4342862

EP4342862 - AQUEOUS BINDER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROCKWOOL A/S
Hovedgaden 584
2640 Hedehusene / DK
[2024/13]
Inventor(s)01 / BARTNIK JOHANSSON, Dorte
2640 Hedehusene / DK
02 / NIKOLIC, Miroslav
2640 Hedehusene / DK
 [2024/13]
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[2024/13]
Application number, filing date23215206.603.04.2020
[2024/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4342862
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
ClassificationIPC:C03C25/32
[2024/13]
CPC:
C03C25/32 (EP); C08J5/244 (US); C08H6/00 (EP);
C08J5/249 (US); C08K5/17 (US); C08K5/20 (US);
C08K5/21 (US); C08K5/29 (US); C08K5/3412 (US);
C08K5/353 (US); C08L97/005 (EP,US); C09J197/005 (EP);
C08J2397/00 (US); C08J2471/02 (US); C08L2205/06 (US);
C08L2312/00 (US) (-)
C-Set:
C09J197/005, C08K5/053 (EP);
C09J197/005, C08L71/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/13]
TitleGerman:WÄSSRIGE BINDEMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2024/13]
English:AQUEOUS BINDER COMPOSITION[2024/13]
French:COMPOSITION DE LIANT AQUEUSE[2024/13]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP20717622.3  / EP4127067
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
08.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inby applicantEP0583086
 US5318990
 WO9936368
 EP0990727
 WO0105725
 WO0196460
 WO0206178
 US2003042344
 WO2004007615
 US6706853
 US6818699
 WO2006061249
 EP1741726
 US2007173588
 WO2008023032
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.