blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4345745

EP4345745 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A CHARACTERISTIC OF A KERATINOUS SURFACE AND METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING SAID KERATINOUS SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2024Publication of search reportpublished on 19.06.2024 [2024/25]
17.05.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
17.05.2024Change - classificationpublished on 19.06.2024 [2024/25]
17.05.2024Change - classificationpublished on 19.06.2024 [2024/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'OREAL
14 rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[2024/14]
Inventor(s)01 / PERROT, Matthieu
92110 Clichy / FR
02 / MALHERBE, Emmanuel
92110 Clichy / FR
03 / CHARBIT, John
92110 Clichy / FR
04 / BOKARIS, Panagiotis-alexandros
92110 Clichy / FR
05 / WASSERMAN, Thierry
92110 Clichy / FR
 [2024/14]
Representative(s)L'Oreal
Service D.I.P.I.
9, rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
[2024/14]
Application number, filing date24151919.820.09.2018
[2024/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4345745
Date:03.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/14]
Type: A3 Search report
No.:EP4345745
Date:19.06.2024
Language:EN
[2024/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2024
ClassificationIPC:G06T7/00, A61B5/00
[2024/25]
CPC:
G06T7/0012 (EP,KR,US); A61B5/0075 (EP,KR,US); A61B5/448 (EP,KR,US);
G06N20/00 (KR); G06T7/10 (US); G06T7/90 (KR,US);
G06T2207/10048 (US); G06T2207/20081 (KR,US); G06T2207/20084 (US);
G06T2207/30088 (US); G06T2207/30201 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Former IPC [2024/14]G06T7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/14]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER EIGENSCHAFT EINER KERATINISCHEN OBERFLÄCHE SOWIE VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER KERATINISCHEN OBERFLÄCHE[2024/14]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A CHARACTERISTIC OF A KERATINOUS SURFACE AND METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING SAID KERATINOUS SURFACE[2024/14]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE CARACTÉRISTIQUE D'UNE SURFACE KÉRATINIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE LADITE SURFACE KÉRATINIQUE[2024/14]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP18195776.2  / EP3627444
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
15.05.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
15.05.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inby applicantUS5478238
 US6067504
 WO2004002300
 US7151851
 US2009036800
 US7508508
 WO2011024160
 US2012253203
 US8428382
 US2014216492
 KR101456942B
 US9316580
 US9519927
 WO2017207455
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.