EP0000061 - Derivatives of carboxylic acid that contain phosphorus, process for their preparation and their utilisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thamm, Horst Dieter, Dr. Parkstrasse 25 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 02 /
Linke, Fritz, Dr. Im Flemetz 8 D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 78100104.5 | 06.06.1978 | Priority number, date | CH19770007299 | 14.06.1977 Original published format: CH 729977 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0000061 | Date: | 20.12.1978 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0000061 | Date: | 15.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1978 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/38, C07F9/30, C08K5/49, C04B13/24, D06M13/26, C02F1/54 | [1980/21] | CPC: |
C07F9/4046 (EP);
C02F5/14 (EP);
C07F9/305 (EP);
C07F9/3235 (EP);
C07F9/3869 (EP);
C07F9/5312 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1980/21] | C07F9/38, C07F9/30, C08K5/49, C04B13/24, D06M13/26, C02B1/54 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Phosphorhaltige Carbonsäure-Derivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, sowie ihre Verwendung | [1980/21] | English: | Derivatives of carboxylic acid that contain phosphorus, process for their preparation and their utilisation | French: | Dérivés d'acide carboxylique contenant du phosphore, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation |
Former [1980/21] | Phosphorhaltige Carbonsaüre-Derivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, sowie ihre Verwendung | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.01.1979 | Examination requested | 30.07.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 11.10.1979 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.1979 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.02.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 15.10.1980 | BE | 06.06.1981 | NL | 01.01.1982 | [1991/48] |
Former [1982/39] | CH | 15.10.1980 | |
BE | 06.06.1981 | Documents cited: | Search | DE1768759 [ ] (PROCTER & GAMBLE); | [P]FR2338948 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH [DE]); | [P]FR2368496 (HOECHST AG [FR], et al) | [ ] - RUSSIAN CHEMICAL REVIEWS 44(6). 1975 Seiten 468-480 |