blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0000334

EP0000334 - 2,4-Diamino-5-benzyl-pyrimidines, process for their preparation and medicines containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1981/32]Benzylpyrimidines, process for their preparation and medicines containing them
[1981/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / Gutsche, Klaus, Dr.
Ehmschenkamp 5
D-2084 Rellingen / DE
02 / Scharwaechter, Peter, Dr.
An der Duene 9
D-2082 Moorrege / DE
03 / Kohlmann, Wilhelm, Dr.
An der Duene 6
D-2082 Moorrege / DE
04 / Kroemer, Gerd, Dr.
verstorben, zuletzt wohnhaft Kaltenweide 100a
D-2200 Elmshorn / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date78100180.516.06.1978
Priority number, dateDE1977273046706.07.1977         Original published format: DE 2730467
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0000334
Date:24.01.1979
Language:DE
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0000334
Date:12.08.1981
Language:DE
[1981/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.1978
ClassificationIPC:C07D239/48, A61K31/505, C07D403/12, C07D413/12
[1981/32]
CPC:
C07D239/49 (EP,US); A61P31/04 (EP); A61P33/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LU,   NL,   SE 
TitleGerman:2,4--Diamino-5-benzylpyrimidine, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende Arzneimittel[1981/32]
English:2,4-Diamino-5-benzyl-pyrimidines, process for their preparation and medicines containing them[1981/32]
French:2,4-Diamino-5-benzylpyrimidines, procédé pour leur préparation et médicaments les contenant[1981/32]
Former [1981/32]Benzylpyrimidine, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende Arzneimittel
Former [1981/32]Benzylpyrimidines, process for their preparation and medicines containing them
Former [1981/32]Benzylpyrimidines, procédé pour leur préparation et médicaments les contenant
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure28.02.1979Examination requested
13.07.1979Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
15.10.1979Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.1980Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
27.01.1981Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.1981Fee for grant paid
17.03.1981Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.1982No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1980Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.1981Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2649449  (GOLDBERG AARON S);
 US2723975  [ ] (GOLDBERG AARON S)
    [ ] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 5, Nov. 1962 Seiten 1.103-1.123 (The American Chemical Society): 5-Benzyl-2,4-diamino-pyrimidines as Antibaterial Agents. I. Synthesis and Antibacterial Activity in vitro: by B. Roth, E.A. FalcoG.H. Hitchings & S.R.M. Bushby.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.