Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP0000182
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0000182Global Dossier 10.01.1979A1
Priority number Date
DE2728152 22.06.1977
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE2728152 05.11.1981C3
DE2728152 26.02.1981B2
DE2728152 04.01.1979A1
Priority number Date
DE2728152 22.06.1977