blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0000698

EP0000698 - Apparatus for preparing hexagonal phosphorous pentoxide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/31]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1981/31]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Brüningstrasse 50
D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hartlapp, Gerhard, Dr.
Kriemhildestrasse 1
D-5030 Hürth-Hermülheim / DE
02 / Kowalski, Werner
Am Ginsterweg
D-5354 Weilerswist-Metternich / DE
03 / Queck, Robert
Bunsenweg 10
D-5030 Hürth-Burbach / DE
04 / Dahmen, Theo
von Westerburgstrasse 24
D-5040 Brühl / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date78100295.103.07.1978
Priority number, dateDE1977273676516.08.1977         Original published format: DE 2736765
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0000698
Date:21.02.1979
Language:DE
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0000698
Date:05.08.1981
Language:DE
[1981/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.1978
ClassificationIPC:C01B25/12
[1981/31]
CPC:
C01B25/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von hexagonalem Phosphorpentoxid
English:Apparatus for preparing hexagonal phosphorous pentoxide
French:Appareil pour la préparation du pentoxyde de phosphore hexagonal
Examination procedure19.07.1979Examination requested
14.08.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.1980Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.1981Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
11.02.1981Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.1981Fee for grant paid
31.03.1981Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.1982No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.1980Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.1981Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]SU179752  ;
 [A]GB197863  (RICHARD THRELFALL);
 [A]US2132360  (MERCHANT MILTON H);
 [A]US2532322  (MCFARLIN CHARLES J);
 [A]FR1292032  (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO);
 [A]FR1305386  (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.