blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0002182

EP0002182 - Bis-azido-phthalic acid derivatives and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CIBA-GEIGY AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / Kvita, Vratislav, Dr.
St. Jakobstrasse 2
CH-4132 Muttenz / CH
02 / Zweifel, Hans, Dr.
Lothringerstrasse 93
CH-4056 Basel / CH
03 / Greber, Gerd, Prof. Dr.
Anzengruberstrasse 11
AT-2540 Bad Vöslau / AT
[N/P]
Application number, filing date78101084.806.10.1978
Priority number, dateCH1977001257914.10.1977         Original published format: CH 1257977
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A3 Search report
No.:EP0002182
Date:
Status:(deleted)
[N/P]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0002182
Date:13.06.1979
Language:DE
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0002182
Date:08.04.1981
Language:DE
[1981/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.1979
ClassificationIPC:C07D209/48, C07C149/43, C07C147/13, C07C117/08, // C08F8/30
[1981/14]
CPC:
C07D209/48 (EP); G03F7/008 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE 
TitleGerman:Bis-Azidophthalsäurederivate und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung
English:Bis-azido-phthalic acid derivatives and process for their preparation
French:Dérivés de l'acide bis-azido-phtalique et procédé pour les préparer
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure03.09.1979Examination requested
17.12.1979Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.02.1980Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.1980Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
25.08.1980Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.1980Fee for grant paid
15.10.1980Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.1982No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.1980Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]US2852379  ;
 [A]GB1309959
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.