blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0002211

EP0002211 - Electrical coupling piece [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CONTRAVES GmbH
Hans-Stiessberger-Strasse 2a
D-8013 Haar / DE
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / Spannehl, Hans-Peter
Eschenweg 17
D-7752 Reichenau 2 / DE
[N/P]
Representative(s)Althoff, Gerhard, et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich, Gunschmann Dr. Körber, Schmidt-Evers Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-8000 München 22 / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/32]Althoff, Gerhard, et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich, Gunschmann Dr. Körber, Schmidt-Evers Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-8000 München 22 / DE
Application number, filing date78101390.917.11.1978
Priority number, dateCH1977001457329.11.1977         Original published format: CH 1457377
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0002211
Date:13.06.1979
Language:DE
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0002211
Date:12.08.1981
Language:DE
[1981/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.1979
ClassificationIPC:G01R1/20, H01R17/20
[1981/32]
CPC:
G01R1/206 (EP); H01H85/485 (EP); H01R24/58 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL 
TitleGerman:Elektrisches Kupplungsstück
English:Electrical coupling piece
French:Pièce de couplage électrique
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure10.07.1979Examination requested
27.02.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.1980Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.1980Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
09.02.1981Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.1981Fee for grant paid
07.05.1981Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.06.1982No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.1980Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL12.08.1981
[1982/20]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE520236  (JAKOB MADERT);
 [A]US2489037  (KAILER LOUIS G);
 [A]US2605318  (MORGENSTERN DAVID M);
 [A]GB1159999  (A F BULGIN & COMPANY LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.