Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0002811

EP0002811 - Device for therapy with interference currents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1982/08]Device for treating the human body with interference currents
[1982/08]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  28.05.1988
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.1991Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 04.12.1991 [1991/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Somartec SA
17 Bd. Helvetique
CH-1311 Genf / CH
[1980/19]
Former [1980/19]For all designated states
Rodler, Hans
Bahnhofplatz 3
D-8228 Freilassing / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rodler, Hans
Bahnhofplatz 3
D-8228 Freilassing / DE
[1982/08]
Former [1980/19]01 / Rodler, Hans
Bahnhofplatz 3 /
Former [1980/19]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Lichti, Heiner , et al
Lichti - Patentanwälte
Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/20]Lichti, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60
D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Former [1980/07]Lichti, Hans, Dr. Ing.
Postfach 410760
D-7500 Karlsruhe 41 (Grötzingen) / DE
Application number, filing date78101805.621.12.1978
Priority number, dateAT1977000930527.12.1977         Original published format: AT 930577
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0002811
Date:11.07.1979
Language:DE
[ N /P ]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0002811
Date:24.02.1982
Language:DE
[1982/08]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0002811
Date:13.07.1988
Language:DE
[1988/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.1979
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/32, H03B21/02
[1982/08]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Interferenzstromtherapie[1982/08]
English:Device for therapy with interference currents[1982/08]
French:Dispositif de thérapie par courants interférenciels[1982/08]
Former [1982/08]Anordnung zur Behandlung mit Interferenzströmen am menschlichen Körper
Former [1982/08]Device for treating the human body with interference currents
Former [1982/08]Dispositif de traitement du corps humain par courants interférentiels
Examination procedure21.02.1979Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU
10.05.1979Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.12.1979Examination requested  [1980/06]
25.09.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0})
24.03.1981Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.1981Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.1981Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
15.07.1981Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.1981Fee for grant paid
06.10.1981Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examinationAppeal received No.  T234/86
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.11.1982  10.12.1982  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1983/04]
Opponent(s)01  15.11.1982  10.12.1982  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
23.12.1982Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.04.1983Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.12.1983Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
04.02.1984Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.02.1985Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.1985Reply to a communication from the opposition division
04.01.1988Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
02.04.1988Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition18.07.1986Appeal received No.  T0234/86
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.1980Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.1981Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE22.12.1987
BE31.12.1987
NL01.07.1988
[1991/49]
Former [1989/21]SE22.12.1987
NL01.07.1988
Former [1989/11]NL01.07.1988
Documents cited:SearchDE1298557  [ ];
 GB1502432  [ ];
 US4071033  [ ];
 DE2632700  [ ];
 US3895639  [ ];
 DE2159437  [ ];
 DE2419768  [ ];
 US3746891  [ ]
    [ ] - MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING Vol 13, No. 1, January 1975 Stevenage GB H.G. GOOVAERTS et al.: "A programmable stimulator for phyziological applications" Seiten 112-118.
    [ ] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIO-MEDICAL ENGINEERING, Vol. BME-18, No. 3, Mai 1971 New York G. SILVERMAN et al.: A programmable parallel timing system" Seiten 201-205.