Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0002811 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0002811



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 387
08.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
06.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
11.02.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
03.06.1988 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
03.06.1988 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
01.06.1988 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
02.04.1988 English translation of the claims Opposition 4
02.04.1988 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
02.04.1988 French translation of claims Opposition 3
04.01.1988 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 1
04.01.1988 Description Opposition 17
04.01.1988 Drawings Opposition 3
16.12.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
16.12.1987 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.12.1987 Refund of fees Appeal 1
17.09.1986 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
17.09.1986 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
17.09.1986 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
05.09.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.08.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.08.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.08.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.08.1986 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.07.1986 Processing of an appeal Opposition 1
24.05.1986 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.05.1986 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.05.1986 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
20.05.1986 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.05.1986 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
20.05.1986 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
20.05.1986 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 2
20.05.1986 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 19
20.05.1986 Means of redress Opposition 1
07.05.1986 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.10.1985 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.09.1985 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.09.1985 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.09.1985 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
10.09.1985 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.09.1985 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.08.1985 Drawings Opposition 3
14.08.1985 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
14.08.1985 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.07.1985 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
17.07.1985 Claims Opposition 3
17.07.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
17.07.1985 Description Opposition 15
17.07.1985 Drawings Opposition 3
16.07.1985 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
21.06.1985 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.06.1985 Claims Opposition 3
14.06.1985 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
13.02.1985 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
13.02.1985 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
18.12.1984 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
30.04.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
27.04.1984 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.04.1984 Description Opposition 5
17.04.1984 Drawings Opposition 1
04.04.1984 Annex to a communication Opposition 15
04.04.1984 Claims Opposition 3
04.04.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
04.04.1984 Drawings Opposition 3
28.03.1984 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
09.02.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
05.12.1983 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.1983 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
01.12.1983 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Opposition 1
01.12.1983 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
01.12.1983 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
01.12.1983 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 4
06.10.1983 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
24.09.1983 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.09.1983 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.09.1983 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.09.1983 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
16.09.1983 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
16.09.1983 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
16.09.1983 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.1983 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.1983 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.1983 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
14.07.1983 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.1983 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
23.12.1982 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.11.1982 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.11.1982 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
15.01.1982 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.10.1981 Claims Search / examination 3
06.10.1981 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.10.1981 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
15.07.1981 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.07.1981 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.06.1981 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.06.1981 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
16.05.1981 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.05.1981 Claims Search / examination 3
16.05.1981 Description Search / examination 15
16.05.1981 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.03.1981 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.02.1981 Claims Search / examination 1
16.02.1981 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
26.01.1981 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.01.1981 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.09.1980 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
03.07.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
02.07.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
02.07.1980 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.05.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
17.05.1980 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
17.05.1980 Request for assignment Search / examination 2
05.02.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
22.01.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
16.01.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
03.01.1980 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
03.01.1980 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
16.07.1979 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 1
28.05.1979 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
08.05.1979 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.05.1979 European search report Search / examination 2
30.03.1979 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
21.02.1979 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of designation fee) Search / examination 1
30.01.1979 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
18.01.1979 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
18.01.1979 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
08.01.1979 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.12.1978 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.12.1978 Claims Search / examination 3
21.12.1978 Description Search / examination 11
21.12.1978 Drawings Search / examination 3
21.12.1978 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.12.1978 Priority document Search / examination 12
21.12.1978 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4