blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0000802

EP0000802 - Metal driving belt [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.05.1989
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Van Doorne's Transmissie B.V.
Dr. Hub van Doorneweg 120 Postbus 500
5026 RA Tilburg / NL
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / Hendriks, Emerie Frederik Marie
Ten Borchwardlaan 172
NL-5591 Le Heeze (N.Br.) / NL
[N/P]
Representative(s)Rosenthal, Saul, et al
c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107
2587 BP Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1981/52]Rosenthal, Saul, Dr., et al
c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107
NL-2587 BP The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date78200129.103.08.1978
Priority number, dateNL1977000863904.08.1977         Original published format: NL 7708639
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0000802
Date:21.02.1979
Language:EN
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0000802
Date:30.12.1981
Language:EN
[1981/52]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0000802
Date:12.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.1978
ClassificationIPC:F16G5/16
[1981/52]
CPC:
F16G5/16 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LU,   NL,   SE 
TitleGerman:Metallischer Treibriemen
English:Metal driving belt
French:Courroie de transmission métallique
Examination procedure14.08.1979Examination requested
31.03.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0})
12.12.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.02.1981Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.1981Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
02.07.1981Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.1981Fee for grant paid
28.09.1981Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.09.1982  12.10.1982  ADMISSIBLE
Standard Elektrik Lorenz AG
Lorenzstrasse 10
D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE
Opponent's representative
Graf, Georg Hugo
Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1982/48]
Opponent(s)01  24.09.1982  12.10.1982  ADMISSIBLE
Standard Elektrik Lorenz AG
Lorenzstrasse 10
D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE
Opponent's representative
Graf, Georg Hugo, Dipl.-Ing.
Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29
D-70449 Stuttgart / DE
04.11.1982Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.03.1983Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.12.1985Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.12.1985Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.03.1988Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
25.05.1988Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.1980Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.1981Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL30.12.1981
LU31.08.1982
SE04.08.1988
CH31.08.1988
[1999/52]
Former [1991/48]NL30.12.1981
SE04.08.1988
CH31.08.1988
Former [1990/03]SE04.08.1988
CH31.08.1988
Former [1989/24]SE04.08.1988
Documents cited:SearchDE2557724  [ ];
 FR81703E  [ ];
 FR2031782  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.