blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0000855

EP0000855 - Pre-controlling process of a continuous tandem train for the hot-rolling of metals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  14.03.1987
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.1996Change - appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSTITUT DE RECHERCHES DE LA SIDERURGIE FRANCAISE (IRSID) France
185, rue Président Roosevelt
F-78105 Saint-Germain-en-Laye / FR
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / Millamon, Philippe
La Ferté Allais
F-91590 Mondeville / FR
[1980/01]
Former [1980/01]01 / Millamon, Philippe
Résidence "Les Jacinthes" Pavillon no 4
Lessy F-57160 Moulins-les-Metz / FR
Representative(s)Thibon-Littaye, Annick
Cabinet A. THIBON-LITTAYE
11, Rue de l'Etang
78160 Marly-le-Roi / FR
[N/P]
Former [1982/36]Thibon-Littaye, Annick
Cabinet A. THIBON-LITTAYE 11 rue de l'Etang
F-78160 Marly-le-Roi / FR
Former [1982/26]Tuppin, Claude
INSTITUT DE RECHERCHES DE LA SIDERURGIE FRANCAISE 185, rue Président Roosevelt
F-78105 St-Germain-en-Laye / FR
Former [1981/04]Tuppin, Claude
INSTITUT DE RECHERCHES DE LA SIDERURGIE FRANCAISE 185, rue Président Roosevelt
F-78105 St-Germain-en-Laye / FR
Application number, filing date78400073.904.08.1978
Priority number, dateFR1977002445708.08.1977         Original published format: FR 7724457
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0000855
Date:21.02.1979
Language:FR
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0000855
Date:28.01.1981
Language:FR
[1981/04]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0000855
Date:29.04.1987
Language:FR
[1987/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.1978
ClassificationIPC:B21B37/12
[1981/04]
CPC:
B21B37/16 (EP); B21B37/52 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Vorsteuern von einer kontinuierlichen Tandemstrasse beim Warmwalzen von Metall
English:Pre-controlling process of a continuous tandem train for the hot-rolling of metals
French:Procédé de préréglage d'un train continu à cages tandem pour le laminage à chaud de produits métalliques
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure22.05.1979Examination requested
05.03.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
19.04.1980Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.1980Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
16.07.1980Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.1980Fee for grant paid
07.10.1980Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.04.1986Request for decision received: Notice of appeal
16.09.1986Result of request for decision (Notice of appeal): Request rejected
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.10.1981  08.12.1981  ADMISSIBLE
BBC Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft
Kallstadter Strasse 1
D-68309 Mannheim / DE
 [1982/07]
22.12.1981Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.06.1982Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.05.1983Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
23.11.1983Reply to a communication from the opposition division
02.02.1984Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
07.04.1984Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
17.05.1985Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.05.1985Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.08.1985Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
04.10.1985Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition19.09.1985Appeal received No.  T0247/85
19.09.1985Statement of grounds filed
17.02.1986Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1986/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1980Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.198003   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.1980
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[D]FR2161757  ;
 [A]FR2323463  ;
 [A]FR2190537  ;
 [A]FR1514209  ;
 [A]US4003229  ;
 [A]FR1505873
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.