blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0006611

EP0006611 - Process for preparing diesters of malonic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ube Industries, Ltd.
12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome
Ube-shi
Yamaguchi-ken 755-0052 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1980/01]For all designated states
UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD.
12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kenji, Nishimura c/o Central Research Labor.
Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-5, Ooaza kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP
02 / Shinichi, Furusaki c/o Central Research Labor.
Ube Industries, Ltd.1978-5, Ooaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP
03 / Yasushi, Shiomi c/o Central Research Labor.
Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-5, Ooaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP
04 / Kozo, Fujii c/o Ube Industries, Ltd.
12-32, 1-chome, Nishi-Honmachi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP
05 / Keigo, Nishihira c/o Ube Industries, Ltd.
12-32, 1-chome, Nishi-Honmachi
Ube-shi, Yamagushi-ken 755 / JP
06 / Masayoshi, Yamashita c/o Ube Industries, Ltd.
12-32, 1-chome, Nishi-Honmachi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP
[1982/04]
Former [1980/01]01 / Kenji, Nishimura c/o Central Research Labor.
Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-5, Ooaza kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP
02 / Shinichi, Furusaki c/o Central Research Labor.
Ube Industries, Ltd.1978-5, Ooaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP
03 / Yashishi, Shiomi c/o Central Research Labor.
Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-5, Ooaza Kogushi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP
04 / Kozo, Fujii c/o Ube Industries, Ltd.
12-32, 1-chome, Nishi-Honmachi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP
05 / Keigo, Nishihira c/o Ube Industries, Ltd.
12-32, 1-chome, Nishi-Honmachi
Ube-shi, Yamagushi-ken 755 / JP
06 / Masayoshi, Yamashita c/o Ube Industries, Ltd.
12-32, 1-chome, Nishi-Honmachi
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP
Representative(s)Eitle, Werner, et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1980/01]Eitle, Werner, Dipl.Ing., et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date79102125.626.06.1979
[1980/01]
Priority number, dateJP1978007980203.07.1978         Original published format: JP 7980278
JP1978015001806.12.1978         Original published format: JP 15001878
[1980/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0006611
Date:09.01.1980
Language:EN
[1980/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0006611
Date:12.08.1981
Language:EN
[1981/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.1979
ClassificationIPC:C07C69/38, C07C67/46
[1980/01]
CPC:
C07C67/46 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C07C67/46, C07C69/38 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1980/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Malonsäurediestern[1980/01]
English:Process for preparing diesters of malonic acid[1980/01]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de diesters d'acide malonique[1980/01]
Examination procedure26.02.1980Examination requested  [1980/10]
30.06.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.08.1980Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.1980Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
16.02.1981Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.1981Fee for grant paid
16.04.1981Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.06.1982No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.1981Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2744567  [ ] (UBE INDUSTRIES);
 GB2009733  [ ] (UBE INDUSTRIES);
 DE2634540  [ ] (LONZA AG)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.