Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0003908

EP0003908 - Chemical process in a medium connected to a rotating body [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC
Imperial Chemical House, Millbank
London SW1P 3JF / GB
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / Cowen, Geoffrey
132 B Seneschal Square Southgate
Runcorn Cheshire / GB
02 / Norton-Berry, Philip
Tan-y-Coed Llandegla
Clwyd Wales / GB
03 / Steel, Margaret Lilian
21 Bunbury Drive
Runcorn Cheshire / GB
[N/P]
Representative(s)Bate, Bernard James , et al
Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents PO Box 6 Welwyn Garden City
Herts, AL7 1HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1980/01]Bate, Bernard James , et al
Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents PO Box 6
Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB
Application number, filing date79300277.521.02.1979
Priority number, dateGB1978000681021.02.1978         Original published format: GB 681078
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0003908
Date:05.09.1979
Language:EN
[ N /P ]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0003908
Date:02.09.1981
Language:EN
[1981/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.1979
ClassificationInternational:B01J19/00, B01J19/28, C08F8/00, B01J19/08, // D01D5/18
[1981/35]
Former International [1981/35]B01J1/00, B01J1/10, C08F8/00, // D01D5/18
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE 
TitleGerman:Chemisches Verfahren in einem Medium, das mit einem rotierenden Körper in Verbindung steht
English:Chemical process in a medium connected to a rotating body
French:Procédé chimique dans un milieu connecté à un corps rotatif
Examination procedure15.01.1980Examination requested  [1980/07]
30.06.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.1980Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.1980Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
16.02.1981Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.1981Fee for grant paid
24.02.1981Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.07.1982No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.1981Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:SearchFR2295789  [ ] (SULZER AG [CH]);
 GB668781  [ ] (REINEVELD MACHF NV);
 FR2383249  [ ] (ICI LTD [GB]);
 US3596312  [ ] (OHMATSU KOEI)