blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0006014

EP0006014 - Drinking cup [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.04.1982
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CROSS PAPERWARE LIMITED
P.O. Box No. 3 Dunstable
Bedfordshire, LU6 3HX / GB
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / Wahl, Adolf
P.O. Box No. 3
Dunstable Bedfordshire, LU6 3HX / GB
[N/P]
Representative(s)Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al
Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
[N/P]
Application number, filing date79301018.231.05.1979
Priority number, dateGB1978002500031.05.1978         Original published format: GB 2500078
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0006014
Date:12.12.1979
Language:EN
[N/P]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.1979
ClassificationIPC:B65D1/26, B65D81/34
CPC:
B65D85/816 (EP); B65D1/265 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LU,   NL,   SE 
TitleGerman:Trinkbecher
English:Drinking cup
French:Gobelet
File destroyed:12.02.1989
Examination procedure30.05.1980Examination requested  [1980/17]
05.11.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.1981Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1982/25]
18.05.1981Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1982/25]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.06.198103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchFR2310733  [ ];
 GB1220343  [ ];
 FR1215401  [ ];
 US2062897  [ ];
 FR2171306  [ ];
 DE2001984  [ ];
 US3526316  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.