Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0006694

EP0006694 - Method of making a selected protein [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  07.12.1991
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
[N/P]
Former [1980/14]For all designated states
PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE
University Place, 4th floor South, 124 Mt. Aubern Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
Former [1980/01]For all designated states
PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE
Cambridge MA 02115 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gilbert, Walter
107 Upland Road
Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US
02 / Broome, Stephanie A.
11 Ware Street
Cambridge Massachusetts 02138 / US
03 / Villa-Komaroff, Lydia J.
15 Pond Circle
Boston, Massachusetts 02130 / US
04 / Efstratiadis, Argiris A.
321 Harvard Street
Cambridge Massachusetts 02138 / US
[1980/03]
Former [1980/01]01 / Gilbert, Walter
107 Upland Road
Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US
02 / Broome, Stephanie A.
17 Chilton Street
Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US
03 / Villa-Komaroff, Lydia J.
15 Pond Circle
Boston, Massachusetts 02130 / US
04 / Efstratiadis, Argiris A.
321 Harvard Street
Cambridge Massachusetts 02138 / US
Representative(s)Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1981/48]Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London, EC1N 2JT / GB
Former [1980/01]Harrison, David Christopher
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date79301054.704.06.1979
[1980/01]
Priority number, dateUS1978091353308.06.1978         Original published format: US 913533
[1980/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0006694
Date:09.01.1980
Language:EN
[1980/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0006694
Date:23.01.1980
Language:EN
[1980/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0006694
Date:12.10.1983
Language:EN
[1983/41]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0006694
Date:22.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1979
ClassificationInternational:C12P21/02, C12N15/62
[1992/04]
Former International [1980/01]C12P21/02, C12N15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1980/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines ausgewählten Proteins[1980/01]
English:Method of making a selected protein[1980/01]
French:Procédé de préparation d'une protéine au choix[1980/01]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure21.07.1980Examination requested  [1980/23]
08.05.1981Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.1981Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.1981Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
06.05.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.1982Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
23.02.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.1983Fee for grant paid
24.05.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.07.1984  09.08.1984  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  12.07.1984  09.08.1984  ADMISSIBLE
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455 /
Unilever Hse, 100 Victoria Embankment, Blackfriars
3013 AL Rotterdam / London EC4Y 0DY / NL
Opponent's representative
van der Toorren, Johannes
Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 03  12.07.1984  09.08.1984  ADMISSIBLE
Gist-brocades n.v.
Wateringseweg 1
NL-2611 XT Delft / NL
Opponent's representative
Huygens, Arthur Victor
c/o Gist-Brocades N.V.
Patents & Trademarks Department
Martinus Nijhofflaan 2
PO Box 1
2600 MA Delft / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2008/32]
Opponent(s)01  12.07.1984  09.08.1984  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  12.07.1984  09.08.1984  ADMISSIBLE
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
van der Toorren, Johannes
Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 03  12.07.1984  09.08.1984  ADMISSIBLE
Gist-brocades n.v.
Wateringseweg 1
NL-2611 XT Delft / NL
Opponent's representative
Huygens, Arthur Victor, Dr.
c/o Gist-Brocades N.V. Patents & Trademarks Department Martinus Nijhofflaan 2 PO Box 1
NL-2600 MA Delft / NL
Former [1984/41]
Opponent(s)01  12.07.1984  09.08.1984  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  12.07.1984  09.08.1984  ADMISSIBLE
Unilever N.V.
Burgemeester's Jacobplein 1
NL-3015 CA Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
van der Toorren, Johannes, Drs.
UNILEVER N.V. Patent Division Postbus 137
NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
 03  12.07.1984  09.08.1984  ADMISSIBLE
Gist-brocades n.v.
Wateringseweg 1
NL-2611 XT Delft / NL
Opponent's representative
Huygens, Arthur Victor, Dr.
c/o Gist-Brocades N.V. Patents & Trademarks Department Martinus Nijhofflaan 2 PO Box 1
NL-2600 MA Delft / NL
Former [1984/38]
Opponent(s)01  12.07.1984  09.08.1984  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
18.09.1984Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.06.1985Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.06.1985Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M07)
25.01.1986Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
25.08.1986Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08)
29.04.1987Reply to a communication from the opposition division
31.08.1990Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
31.08.1990Date of oral proceedings
04.09.1990Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.11.1990Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.05.1991Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
09.07.1991Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition20.01.1989Appeal received No.  T0060/89
13.04.1989Statement of grounds filed
31.08.1990Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.1981Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1982Renewal fee patent year 04
20.05.1983Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[PE]EP0001930  (GENENTECH INC [US])
    [ ] - SCIENCE, Vol. 198, 9 December 1977, K. ITAKURA et al "Expression in Escherichia coli of a chemically synthesized gene for the hormone somatostatin", pages 1056-1063.
 [P]  - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, Vol. 75, No. 8, August 1978. LYDIA VILLA-KOMAROFF et al. "A bacterial clone synthesizing proinsulin", pages 3727-3731
 [P]  - NATURE, Vol. 275, 12 October 1978 ODILE MERCEREAU-PUIJALON et al. "Synthesis of an ovalbumin like protein by Escherichia coli K12 harbouring a recombinant plasmid". pages 505-510.
 [P]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 90, No. 15, 1979-04, Abstr. 117847f, page 319. Columbus, Ohio, USA GOEDDEL, D.V. et al. "Expression in Escherichia coli of chemically synthesized genes for human insulin". & Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, 1979, 76(1), 106-10.
 [A]  - SCIENCE, Vol. 196, 17 June 1977, A. ULLRICH et al. "Rat insulin genes: construction of plasmids containing the coding sequences", pages 1313-1319