Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0007222 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0007222



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 326
08.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
06.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
11.08.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
05.11.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.11.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.01.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
29.01.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 32
29.01.1992 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
20.01.1992 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
09.01.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.01.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.11.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.11.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.10.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.04.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.05.1990 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.02.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.11.1988 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.11.1988 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.03.1988 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
18.03.1988 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.03.1988 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.02.1988 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Appeal 1
15.02.1988 French translation of claims Appeal 3
15.02.1988 German translation of the claims Appeal 3
10.02.1988 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Appeal 1
10.02.1988 French translation of claims Appeal 3
10.02.1988 German translation of the claims Appeal 3
07.01.1988 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.12.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
28.12.1987 Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) Opposition 1
28.12.1987 Means of redress Opposition 1
11.08.1987 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 1
13.07.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
01.07.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
29.05.1987 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.05.1987 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
26.05.1987 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.1987 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.1987 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
17.12.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.12.1986 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
22.05.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.05.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.05.1986 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.04.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
15.04.1986 Text intended for grant Opposition 16
21.03.1986 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
21.03.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
06.03.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.12.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
22.11.1985 Annex Search / examination 1
22.11.1985 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.10.1985 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.10.1985 Description Opposition 1
22.10.1985 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.09.1985 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
05.09.1985 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
27.08.1985 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.03.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
01.02.1985 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
28.09.1984 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
25.09.1984 Claims Opposition 1
25.09.1984 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
22.06.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
22.06.1984 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.05.1984 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.05.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.04.1984 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
13.04.1984 Request for written evidence Opposition 1
04.04.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
04.04.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
28.03.1984 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.02.1984 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.02.1984 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
18.07.1983 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.06.1983 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
21.06.1983 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.04.1983 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.02.1983 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
11.02.1983 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.01.1983 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.01.1983 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
21.01.1983 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
29.11.1982 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
21.10.1982 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
09.08.1982 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.08.1982 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
24.06.1982 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
22.06.1982 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
22.06.1982 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.05.1982 Description Search / examination 6
05.05.1982 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.04.1982 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.03.1982 Claims Search / examination 1
13.03.1982 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.02.1982 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.12.1981 Claims Search / examination 3
02.12.1981 Drawings Search / examination 1
02.12.1981 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
02.12.1981 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.10.1981 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
15.09.1981 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.07.1981 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.07.1981 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
11.07.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
01.07.1980 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.07.1980 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
30.01.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
30.11.1979 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.11.1979 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.11.1979 European search report Search / examination 2
28.09.1979 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.09.1979 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.09.1979 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.09.1979 Subsequently filed documents not duly signed Search / examination 1
23.08.1979 Drawings Search / examination 2
23.08.1979 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.08.1979 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.07.1979 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
25.07.1979 Priority document Search / examination 19
09.07.1979 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.07.1979 Claims Search / examination 4
09.07.1979 Description Search / examination 16
09.07.1979 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.07.1979 Drawings Search / examination 2
09.07.1979 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4