Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0007790

EP0007790 - Driverless vehicle carrying non-directional detectors auto-guided by light signals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.06.1985
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC
Imperial Chemical House, Millbank
London SW1P 3JF / GB
[1980/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Halsall, James Richard
26 Whitley Close Moughland Lane
-Runcorn, Cheshire WA7 4SJ / GB
02 / Larcombe, Michael Henry Ellis
31 Cloud Green
Cannon Park, Coventry / GB
03 / Robertson, James Richie
"West Winds" 447 Chester Road Hartford
Northwich, Cheshire CW8 2AG / GB
04 / Rogers, Mark Anthony Meyrick
Canonburg Upton Park
Chester, Cheshire / GB
[1980/03]
Representative(s)Bate, Bernard James , et al
Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents PO Box 6 Welwyn Garden City
Herts, AL7 1HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1980/03]Bate, Bernard James , et al
Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents PO Box 6
Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB
Application number, filing date79301461.424.07.1979
[1980/03]
Priority number, dateGB1931008497801.08.1978         Original published format: GB 3184978
[1980/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0007790
Date:06.02.1980
Language:EN
[1980/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1979
ClassificationInternational:G05D1/02, G01S1/70
[1980/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1980/03]
TitleGerman:Unbemanntes, durch Lichtsignale selbst-gesteuertes Fahrzeug mit nicht-gerichteten Empfangseinrichtungen[1980/03]
English:Driverless vehicle carrying non-directional detectors auto-guided by light signals[1980/03]
French:Véhicule sans conducteur porteur de détecteurs non-directionnels et autoguidé par signaux lumineux[1980/03]
Examination procedure28.06.1980Examination requested  [1980/19]
23.11.1982Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
15.06.1984Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1985/33]
12.12.1984Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.110(2) in appeal  [1985/33]
Appeal following examination21.01.1983Appeal received No.  T0079/83
04.06.1984Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1984/24]
Request for further processing for:31.08.1981Request for further processing filed
31.08.1981Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.09.1981Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.1981Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.1982Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.1983Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.1984Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:SearchDE738336  [ ];
 US4023753  [ ];
 GB1173442  [ ];
 GB1313928  [ ];
 GB1448623  [ ];
 FR2336726  [ ];
 US4015536  [ ];
 US3710335  [ ];
 US3687556  [ ]