Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0026800

EP0026800 - Folding bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.1985
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.06.1985 [1985/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BROMPTON BICYCLE LIMITED
The Old Power House Kew Garden Station
Richmond, Surrey, England / GB
[N/P]
Former [1981/15]For all designated states
BROMPTON BICYCLE LIMITED
The Old Power House Kew Garden Station
Richmond, Surrey, England / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Ritchie, Andrew William
53, Egerton Gardens
London, S.W.3 / GB
[1981/15]
Representative(s)Warren, Anthony Robert , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1981/15]Warren, Anthony Robert , et al
BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date79302096.703.10.1979
[1981/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0026800
Date:15.04.1981
Language:EN
[1981/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0026800
Date:30.05.1984
Language:EN
[1984/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.1980
ClassificationInternational:B62K15/00
[1981/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   NL [1981/15]
TitleGerman:Zusammenklappbares Fahrrad[1981/15]
English:Folding bicycle[1981/15]
French:Bicyclette pliante[1981/15]
Examination procedure05.10.1981Examination requested  [1981/50]
20.07.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
15.07.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.1983Fee for grant paid
13.10.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.1981Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.1982Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.1983Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:SearchUS3993322  [ ] (VAN TIJEN REINDER);
 BE628783  [ ];
 BE464801  [ ];
 US3710883  [ ] (RIZZO P)
by applicantBE628783
 US3983322