Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0011388

EP0011388 - System and method for processing documents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCR CANADA LTD - NCR CANADA LTEE
6865 Century Avenue Mississauga
Ontario, L5N 2E2 / CA
[N/P]
Former [1980/11]For all designated states
NCR CANADA LTD - NCR CANADA LTEE
6865 Century Avenue
Mississauga Ontario, L5N 2E2 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Nally, Robert Blaize
72 Norman Street
Waterloo Ontario / CA
[1980/11]
Representative(s)Robinson, Robert George
International Intellectual Property Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1980/11]Robinson, Robert George
International Patent Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Application number, filing date79302258.318.10.1979
[1980/11]
Priority number, dateUS1978095304619.10.1978         Original published format: US 953046
[1980/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0011388
Date:28.05.1980
Language:EN
[1980/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0011388
Date:01.12.1982
Language:EN
[1982/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1980
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/66, G07C11/00
[1980/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1980/11]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Dokumentverarbeitung[1980/11]
English:System and method for processing documents[1980/11]
French:Système et méthode pour le traitement de documents[1980/11]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure22.05.1980Examination requested  [1980/16]
26.03.1981Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.1981Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.1982Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
02.06.1982Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.1982Fee for grant paid
30.06.1982Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.09.1983No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.1981Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.1982Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:SearchDE2747498  [ ] (INFORMER INC);
 DE2049148  [ ] (MUELLER J)