blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0010981

EP0010981 - Induction motor drive apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1980/10]Motor drive apparatus
[1984/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.1985
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.07.1985 [1985/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi 401-05 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1983/43]For all designated states
FANUC LTD.
3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura
Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP
Former [1980/11]For all designated states
Fanuc Ltd
5-1, Asahigaoka, 3-chome
Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / JP
Former [1980/10]For all designated states
FANUC LTD.
3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura
Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawada, Shigeki
346-15, Oaza-Shimoda
Hino-shi Tokyo / JP
02 / Ishida, Hiroshi
2-73, Matsubara-cho 2-chome, Hamura-machi
Nishitama-gun Tokyo / JP
03 / Koiwai, Yutaka
12-27, Kita-shinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1980/10]
Representative(s)Bedggood, Guy Stuart, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1980/10]Bedggood, Guy Stuart, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date79302435.702.11.1979
[1980/10]
Priority number, dateJP1978013606904.11.1978         Original published format: JP 13606978
[1980/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0010981
Date:14.05.1980
Language:EN
[1980/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0010981
Date:27.06.1984
Language:EN
[1984/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1980
ClassificationIPC:H02P5/34, H02P5/40, H02P7/62, G05F1/00
[1980/10]
CPC:
H02P27/045 (EP,US); H02P27/048 (EP,US); H02P2207/01 (EP,US);
H02P27/047 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1980/10]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Antrieb eines Induktionsmotors[1984/26]
English:Induction motor drive apparatus[1984/26]
French:Dispositif d'entraînement d'un moteur à induction[1984/26]
Former [1980/10]Vorrichtung zum Antrieb eines Motors
Former [1980/10]Motor drive apparatus
Former [1980/10]Dispositif d'entraînement d'un moteur
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure31.10.1980Examination requested  [1981/02]
10.11.1981Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.10.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
23.11.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.1983Fee for grant paid
19.12.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.03.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1981Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1982Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.1983Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS3700986  [ ] (CUSHMAN PAUL G, et al);
 DE2521860  [ ] (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE)
    [ ] - BROWN BOVERI MITTEILUNGEN, No. 9, 1971, Baden J. FORNASIERI et al. "Frequenzgeregelte Antriebe mit Kafigankermotoren" pages 407 to 415 * page 409, right-hand column, paragraph 2 to page 410, last paragraph; fig. 6 and 7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.