Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0012605

EP0012605 - Shaped products of polypropylene [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  14.01.1991
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka 541-8550 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1980/13]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED
Kitahama 4-chome 5-33
Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shiga, Akinobu
No. 13-12, Maeda-cho
Niihama-shi Ehime / JP
02 / Matsuyama, Kiyoshi
8-15, Hoshigoe-cho
Niihama-shi Ehime / JP
03 / Kakugo, Masahiro
No. 11-31, Maeda-cho
Niihama-shi Ehime / JP
04 / Naito, Yukio
No.6-448, Ikku-cho 2-chome
Niihama-shi Ehime / JP
05 / Ima, Seiichiro
No. 9-12, Maedo-cho
Niihama-shi Ehime / JP
[1980/13]
Representative(s)Dixon, Donald Cossar , et al
Wilson Gunn Gee
Chancery House
Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1983/37]Dixon, Donald Cossar , et al
Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
Former [1980/13]Dixon, Donald Cossar
Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane
London WC2 1QU / GB
Application number, filing date79302879.613.12.1979
[1980/13]
Priority number, dateJP1978015597313.12.1978         Original published format: JP 15597378
JP1978016513429.12.1978         Original published format: JP 16513478
[1980/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0012605
Date:25.06.1980
Language:EN
[1980/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0012605
Date:30.01.1985
Language:EN
[1985/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.1980
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/12, C08J5/18, H01B3/00, H01B3/52
[1980/13]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   IT,   NL [1980/13]
TitleGerman:Geformte Gegenstände aus Polypropylen[1980/13]
English:Shaped products of polypropylene[1980/13]
French:Produits manufacturés en polypropylène[1980/13]
Examination procedure16.12.1980Examination requested  [1981/11]
16.09.1981Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.11.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
22.06.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.1984Fee for grant paid
21.09.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.10.1985  20.11.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Hoechst Aktiengesellschaft Werk Kalle-Albert
Zentrale Patentabteilung KA
D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  30.10.1985  30.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Naamloze Vennootschap DSM
Het Overloon 1
NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R.
DSM Patents & Trademarks
Office Geleen
Postbus 9
6160 MA Geleen / NL
 03  30.10.1985  31.10.1985  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Ltd.
No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome Higashiku Osaka-shi,Osaka-fu
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Dixon, Donald Cossar
Wilson Gunn Gee
Chancery House
Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
 [N/P]
Former [1986/44]
Opponent(s)01  21.10.1985  20.11.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Hoechst Aktiengesellschaft Werk Kalle-Albert
Zentrale Patentabteilung KA
D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  30.10.1985  30.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Naamloze Vennootschap DSM
Het Overloon 1
NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland
OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9
NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL
 03  30.10.1985  31.10.1985  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Ltd.
No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashiku, Osaka-shi,Osaka-fu
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Dixon, Donald Cossar
Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
Former [1986/35]
Opponent(s)01  21.10.1985  20.11.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Hoechst Aktiengesellschaft Werk Kalle-Albert
Zentrale Patentabteilung KA
D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  30.10.1985  30.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Naamloze Vennootschap DSM
Het Overloon 1
NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
van Golde, Lambertus Maria Gerardus T.
OCTROOIBUREAU DSM P.O. Box 9
NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL
 03  30.10.1985  31.10.1985  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Ltd.
No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashiku, Osaka-shi,Osaka-fu
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Dixon, Donald Cossar
Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
Former [1986/02]
Opponent(s)01  21.10.1985   
Hoechst Aktiengesellschaft Werk Kalle-Albert
Zentrale Patentabteilung KA
D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  30.10.1985   
Naamloze Vennootschap DSM
Het Overloon 1
NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Opponent's representative
van Golde, Lambertus Maria Gerardus T.
OCTROOIBUREAU DSM P.O. Box 9
NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL
 03  30.10.1985   
Sumitomo Chemical Company, Ltd.
No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashiku, Osaka-shi,Osaka-fu
Osaka / JP
Opponent's representative
Dixon, Donald Cossar
Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
Former [1985/52]
Opponent(s)01  21.10.1985   
Hoechst Aktiengesellschaft Werk Kalle-Albert
Zentrale Patentabteilung KA
D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE
04.03.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.09.1986Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.09.1986Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
27.03.1987Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
28.10.1987Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07)
27.05.1988Reply to a communication from the opposition division
30.05.1989Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
19.11.1990Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/10]
Appeal following opposition01.08.1989Appeal received No.  T0491/89
07.11.1989Statement of grounds filed
19.11.1990Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
19.11.1990Date of oral proceedings
20.11.1990Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for re-establishment of rights:21.12.1989Date of receipt
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1981Renewal fee patent year 03
04.11.1982Renewal fee patent year 04
05.11.1983Renewal fee patent year 05
19.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.01.198203   M06   Fee paid on   18.03.1982
Documents cited:SearchDE1917657  [ ];
 FR2143422  [ ];
 FR2144896  [ ];
 US3018263  [ ]