Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0012605 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0012605



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 965
18.07.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
14.01.1991 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
08.01.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.01.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.01.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.11.1990 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.11.1990 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.11.1990 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.11.1990 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
19.11.1990 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 13
19.11.1990 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
12.11.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.09.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.09.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
08.09.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
08.09.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.09.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.09.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
04.09.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
04.09.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
31.08.1990 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
18.07.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.07.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
21.12.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
21.12.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
21.12.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 31
09.11.1989 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
07.11.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
31.10.1989 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 14
28.10.1989 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
28.10.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.10.1989 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
21.08.1989 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
03.08.1989 Processing of an appeal Opposition 1
01.08.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
07.06.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.06.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
05.06.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.06.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.05.1989 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
30.05.1989 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
30.05.1989 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
30.05.1989 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
30.05.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
30.05.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.04.1989 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
17.03.1989 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
17.11.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.11.1988 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
31.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
30.10.1988 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
30.10.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.10.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
28.09.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.09.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.09.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.09.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.09.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
16.09.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
16.09.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
16.09.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
14.09.1988 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
30.08.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.08.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
25.08.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
20.08.1988 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.05.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 10
18.05.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
13.05.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.05.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.05.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
31.03.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.03.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.03.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
11.03.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.03.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.03.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.03.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.03.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.03.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.03.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.03.1988 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
05.03.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
01.03.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.02.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
25.01.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
21.01.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.11.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.11.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.10.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
29.10.1987 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
27.10.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.10.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.10.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.09.1987 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
08.04.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.04.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.04.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.03.1987 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
09.02.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
29.01.1987 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.01.1987 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
22.09.1986 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.09.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
19.09.1986 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
04.09.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
04.09.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.09.1986 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 21
04.08.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.07.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.07.1986 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
09.07.1986 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.07.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
08.07.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.03.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.03.1986 Communication: The notice of opposition is deemed not to have been filed Opposition 1
31.01.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.01.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.11.1985 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.11.1985 N/A Opposition 1
07.11.1985 N/A Opposition 1
06.11.1985 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.11.1985 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
02.11.1985 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 63
31.10.1985 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
31.10.1985 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
28.10.1985 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.10.1985 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
22.10.1985 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.10.1985 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
22.10.1985 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 67
22.10.1985 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.10.1985 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.10.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
10.06.1985 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.06.1985 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.12.1984 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.09.1984 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.09.1984 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
03.09.1984 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
22.06.1984 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
11.05.1984 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.03.1984 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.03.1984 Text intended for grant Search / examination 90
03.02.1984 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
15.12.1982 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.11.1982 Claims Search / examination 2
28.10.1982 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
22.09.1982 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.03.1982 Notice drawing attention to the decision of the Administrative Council from 05.06.1991 Search / examination 1
01.03.1982 Claims Search / examination 1
01.03.1982 Description Search / examination 12
01.03.1982 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
15.01.1982 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.01.1982 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.01.1982 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.01.1982 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.09.1981 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
11.07.1981 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.12.1980 Annex Search / examination 1
16.12.1980 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
13.09.1980 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.07.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
02.05.1980 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
08.04.1980 European search report Search / examination 1
08.04.1980 European search report Search / examination 1
04.03.1980 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
04.03.1980 Priority document Search / examination 22
04.03.1980 Priority document Search / examination 41
04.03.1980 Translation of priority document Search / examination 37
04.03.1980 Translation of priority document Search / examination 21
04.02.1980 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 2
13.12.1979 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.12.1979 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
13.12.1979 Claims Search / examination 2
13.12.1979 Description Search / examination 27
13.12.1979 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.12.1979 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.12.1979 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
13.12.1979 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
13.12.1979 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 54
13.12.1979 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 20
13.12.1979 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
13.12.1979 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 22
13.12.1979 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
13.12.1979 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4