blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0006044

EP0006044 - Process for producing optical fibres having a radial gradient index of refraction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1981/39]Process for producing optical fibres having a radial gradient index of refraction and an optical fibre produced by this process
[1981/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON-CSF
173, Boulevard Haussmann
F-75008 Paris / FR
[1982/21]
Former [1980/12]For all designated states
THOMSON-CSF
173, Boulevard Haussmann
F-75008 Paris / FR
Former [1980/12]For all designated states
THOMSON-CSF
173, boulevard Haussmann
F-75379 Paris Cédex 08 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / De Panafieu, Arnaud
"THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, bld Haussmann
F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR
02 / Baylac, Christiane
"THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, bld Haussman
F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR
03 / Nemaud, Yves
"THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, bld Haussmann
F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR
04 / Turpin, Marc
"THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, bld Haussmann
F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR
05 / Faure, Michel
"THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, bld Haussmann
F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR
[N/P]
Representative(s)Giraud, Pierre, et al
THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann
75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1981/39]Giraud, Pierre, et al
THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann
F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR
Application number, filing date79400308.716.05.1979
Priority number, dateFR1978001603530.05.1978         Original published format: FR 7816035
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0006044
Date:12.12.1979
Language:FR
[N/P]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0006044
Date:30.09.1981
Language:FR
[1981/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.1979
ClassificationIPC:C03B37/02, C03C13/00, C03C15/00, G02B5/14
[1981/39]
CPC:
C03C13/045 (EP,US); C03C13/046 (EP,US); C03C15/00 (EP,US);
C03C23/008 (EP,US); G02B6/0281 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Lichtleitfasern mit radialem Brechungsindexgradienten[1981/39]
English:Process for producing optical fibres having a radial gradient index of refraction[1981/39]
French:Procédé de fabrication de fibres optiques à gradient radial d'indice de réfraction[1981/39]
Former [1981/39]Verfahren zur Herstellung von Lichtleitfasern mit radialem Brechungsindexgradienten und nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Lichtleitfaser
Former [1981/39]Process for producing optical fibres having a radial gradient index of refraction and an optical fibre produced by this process
Former [1981/39]Procédé de fabrication de fibres optiques à gradient radial d'indice de réfraction, et fibre optique obtenue par ce procédé
Examination procedure21.12.1979Examination requested  [1980/06]
15.10.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.11.1980Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.1981Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
10.03.1981Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.1981Fee for grant paid
09.05.1981Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.06.1982No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.1981Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchFR2178038  [ ] (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]);
 FR2368444  [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]);
 FR2301489  [ ] (JENAER GLASWERK SCHOTT & GEN [DE]);
 FR2227234  [ ] (MACEDO PEDRO DE [US]);
 FR2021614  [ ] (NIPPON SELFOC CO LTD)
    [ ] - NTG-FACHBERICHTE, Volume 59, 1977, Third European Conference on Optical Communication, 14-16 Setembre 1977, Munich (VDE-VerlagBerlin) A. DE PANAFIEU et al "Direct fabrication of medium-loss graded-index preforms by the phase separation and leaching technique" pages 21 a 23.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.