blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0027487

EP0027487 - Process and device for the treatment of lignocellulose materials bound with formaldehyde resins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.04.1984
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.1984Refusal of applicationpublished on 27.06.1984 [1984/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Verbestel, Jean-Baptiste
Van Maerlant straat, 4
B-8500 Kortrijk / BE
[1981/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1981/17]
Representative(s)Kuborn, Jacques, et al
Office Hanssens S.P.R.L.
Square Marie-Louise 40
Bte 19
1040 Bruxelles / BE
[N/P]
Former [1981/17]Kuborn, Jacques, et al
Office Hanssens S.P.R.L. Square Marie-Louise, 40 (bte 19)
B-1040 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date79870025.818.10.1979
[1981/17]
Priority number, dateBE1979019757310.10.1979         Original published format: BE 197573
[1981/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0027487
Date:29.04.1981
Language:FR
[1981/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.1981
ClassificationIPC:B29J5/00
[1981/17]
CPC:
C08K3/28 (EP)
C-Set:
C08K3/28, C08L97/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1981/17]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Lignocellulose-Materialien, die mit Hilfe von Formaldehydharzen gebunden sind[1981/17]
English:Process and device for the treatment of lignocellulose materials bound with formaldehyde resins[1981/17]
French:Procédé et dispositif de traitement de matériaux lignocellulosiques liés à l'aide de résines à base de formaldéhyde[1981/17]
File destroyed:14.07.1990
Examination procedure03.07.1981Examination requested  [1981/38]
01.09.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.10.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
22.08.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.1984Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1984/26]
20.01.1984Application refused, date of legal effect [1984/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.1981Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.11.198204   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.1983
31.10.198305   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2903254  [ ];
 FR2379374  [ ];
 DE2804514  [ ];
 BE863579  [ ];
 EP0001237  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.