blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0006836

EP0006836 - Means and method for removal of seat rings in ball valves [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1980/01]Means and method for in-line removal of seat rings in ball valves
[1982/02]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACF INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED
750 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10012 / US
[1980/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Kacal, Gary W.
P.O. Box 491 5203 J.Albert Drive
East Bernard, Texas 77435 / US
02 / Partridge, Charles C.
11136 Cedarview
Houston Texas 77041 / US
[1980/01]
Representative(s)Kretschmer, Adolf
Schottengasse 3a
A-1014 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1980/01]Kretschmer, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Schottengasse 3a
A-1014 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date79890002.302.05.1979
[1980/01]
Priority number, dateUS1978090232403.05.1978         Original published format: US 902324
[1980/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0006836
Date:09.01.1980
Language:EN
[1980/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0006836
Date:13.01.1982
Language:EN
[1982/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.1979
ClassificationIPC:F16K5/06, F16K27/06
[1980/01]
CPC:
F16K5/0636 (EP,US); F16K43/00 (EP,US); Y10T137/0508 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1980/01]
TitleGerman:Mittel und Verfahren um die Dichtungsringe eines Kugelhahnes auszubauen[1982/02]
English:Means and method for removal of seat rings in ball valves[1982/02]
French:Moyens et procédé pour démonter les sièges d'un robinet sphérique[1982/02]
Former [1980/01]Mittel und Verfahren um die Dichtungsringe eines Kugelhahnes während des Betriebes auszubauen
Former [1980/01]Means and method for in-line removal of seat rings in ball valves
Former [1980/01]Moyens et procédé pour démonter les sièges d'un robinet sphérique en service
Examination procedure03.07.1980Examination requested  [1980/19]
28.11.1980Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.1981Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.1981Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
22.07.1981Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.1981Fee for grant paid
20.10.1981Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.1982No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.1981Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchGB729893  [ ] (PARKER APPLIANCE CO);
 FR1511626  [ ] (BOUVIER ATELIERS);
 FR91993E  [ ] (BOUVIER ATELIERS);
 US3960363  [ ] (DOMYAN FRANK F)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.