blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0014449

EP0014449 - Preparation of 5-nitrobenzimidazolone-2 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2016
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/17]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1980/17]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Postfach 80 03 20
D-65926 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mees, Bernhard, Dr.
Gräfliche Strasse 31
D-6239 Eppstein/Taunus / DE
02 / Ribka, Joachim, Dr.
Rügener Strasse 4
D-6050 Offenbach/Main / DE
[1980/17]
Application number, filing date80100536.404.02.1980
[1980/17]
Priority number, dateDE1979290512610.02.1979         Original published format: DE 2905126
[1980/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0014449
Date:20.08.1980
Language:DE
[1980/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0014449
Date:03.09.1980
Language:DE
[1980/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0014449
Date:27.04.1983
Language:DE
[1983/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.1980
ClassificationIPC:C07D235/26
[1980/17]
CPC:
C07D235/26 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1980/17]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von 5-Nitrobenzimidazolon-(2)[1980/17]
English:Preparation of 5-nitrobenzimidazolone-2[1980/17]
French:Procédé de préparation de 5-nitrobenzimidazol-2-one[1980/17]
Examination procedure13.02.1981Examination requested  [1981/16]
21.06.1982Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
22.07.1982Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1982Fee for grant paid
04.10.1982Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.01.1984No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - MONATSHEFTE FUR CHEMIE, Band 107, Heft 4, Juli/August 1976, Seiten 1307-1310 Wien, AT. H. SCHINDLBAUER et al.: "Zur direkten Nitrierung des Benzimidazolons und der Reduktion einiger dieser Nitrierungsprodukte" * Seite 1309, Komponent 1a *
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 51, Nr. 17, 10. September 1957, Spalte 12882f L.S. EFROS et al.: "Imidazole derivatives. XV. Nitration of benzimidazolone and 1,3-dimethyl-benzimidazolone" & ZHUR. OBSHCHEI KHIM. 27, 127-35 1957 * Zusammenfassung *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.