Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0014923

EP0014923 - Method for baling fibrous material and a baling press therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  21.12.1993
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vepa AG
Bettingerstrasse 32
CH-4125 Riehen/Basel / CH
For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1980/18]For all designated states
Vepa AG
Bettingerstrasse 32
CH-4125 Riehen/Basel / CH
For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / * * *
02 / Rewitzer, Siegfried
Am Veilchenhang 16
D-8429 Ihrlerstein / DE
[1980/18]
Representative(s)Lederer, Franz , et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/14]Lederer, Franz, Dr. , et al
Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1990/21]Gross, Karl-Friedrich, Dr.
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20
D-6230 Frankfurt/Main 80 / DE
Former [1980/18]Reuter, Johann-Heinrich, Dr.
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20
D-6230 Frankfurt/Main 80 / DE
Application number, filing date80100660.208.02.1980
[1980/18]
Priority number, dateDE1979290622917.02.1979         Original published format: DE 2906229
DE1979291195827.03.1979         Original published format: DE 2911958
[1980/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0014923
Date:03.09.1980
Language:DE
[1980/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0014923
Date:26.08.1987
Language:DE
[1987/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.1980
ClassificationInternational:B65B27/12, B30B9/30
[1980/18]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1980/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Verpacken von faserigem Gut in Ballen sowie geeignetes Pressensystem dazu[1980/18]
English:Method for baling fibrous material and a baling press therefor[1980/18]
French:Procédé pour emballer des matériaux fibreux en balles et presse pour sa mise en oeuvre[1980/18]
Examination procedure12.02.1981Examination requested  [1981/16]
17.03.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
27.08.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
24.01.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.1983Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.08.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
23.02.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.1987Fee for grant paid
22.05.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination28.01.1984Appeal received No.  T0887/90
14.04.1984Statement of grounds filed
10.12.1984Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1984/51]
18.02.1985Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1985/08]
03.06.1986Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1986/23]
18.06.1986Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1986/25]
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.05.1988  08.08.1988  ADMISSIBLE
AUTEFA GmbH
Postfach 11 53
D-86313 Friedberg / DE
Opponents representative
Ernicke, Hans-Dieter
Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke
Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1988/31]
Opponent(s)01  25.05.1988  08.08.1988  ADMISSIBLE
AUTEFA GmbH
Postfach 11 53
D-86313 Friedberg / DE
Opponents representative
Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Schwibbogenplatz 2b
D-86153 Augsburg / DE
27.07.1988No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
03.08.1988No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
10.08.1988Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.02.1989Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.02.1989Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M05)
28.07.1989Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
06.10.1993Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1994/06]
06.10.1993Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition15.11.1990Appeal received No.  T0887/90
23.01.1991Statement of grounds filed
06.10.1993Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
06.10.1993Date of oral proceedings
12.10.1993Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.1984Renewal fee patent year 05
16.01.1985Renewal fee patent year 06
16.01.1986Renewal fee patent year 07
17.01.1987Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:SearchDE1951113  [ ] (LINDEMANN MASCHFAB GMBH);
 DE1936493  [ ] (CONTINENTAL MOSS GORDIN INC);
 DE2736316  [ ] (HOECHST AG);
 DE1239656  [ ] (HOECHST AG);
 DE1586017  [ ] (DEMAG AG);
 DE2523043  [ ] (LINDEMANN MASCHFAB GMBH);
 DE1938602  [ ];
 DE2042004  [ ];
 DE2515158  [ ] (LINKE JOHANNES);
 AT264294B  [ ] (LINDEMANN MASCHFAB GMBH [DE])
by applicantDE2523043
 DE2042004
 DD48303
 DE2736316