Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0014923 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0014923



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 643
28.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
02.03.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
14.03.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.12.1993 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
17.12.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.12.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
06.10.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
06.10.1993 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
24.09.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.09.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
17.09.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
17.09.1993 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
05.07.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.07.1993 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
01.07.1993 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
01.07.1993 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
01.07.1993 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
28.06.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
25.06.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
17.06.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.06.1993 Claims Appeal 6
08.06.1993 Claims Appeal 6
08.06.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.05.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.05.1993 Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings Appeal 1
17.02.1992 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
10.02.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.01.1992 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
31.01.1992 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
31.01.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.07.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.07.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
06.06.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.06.1991 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.06.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.05.1991 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
24.05.1991 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
04.02.1991 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.01.1991 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.01.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.01.1991 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.1991 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.1991 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.01.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
23.01.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
10.12.1990 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.12.1990 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.11.1990 Authorisation of representative Appeal 2
15.11.1990 Authorisation of representative Appeal 2
15.11.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
15.11.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
15.11.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.11.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.11.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.11.1990 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
22.09.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.09.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.09.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
17.09.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
17.09.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
17.09.1990 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
17.09.1990 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
17.09.1990 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
17.09.1990 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.1990 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
09.04.1990 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.04.1990 Deletion of the entry relating to the representative ('et al' case) Search / examination 1
15.03.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.03.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.02.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.02.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.02.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.02.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.02.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.02.1990 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.02.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.02.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
12.02.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
12.02.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
12.02.1990 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
12.02.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.02.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.01.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.01.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.12.1989 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.1989 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.07.1989 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 8
07.07.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.06.1989 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
24.02.1989 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
18.02.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.02.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.02.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.02.1989 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
17.02.1989 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
15.12.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.12.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.08.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.08.1988 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
03.08.1988 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
03.08.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.07.1988 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 1
10.06.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.05.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
25.05.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.05.1988 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
25.05.1988 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
16.07.1987 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.05.1987 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.05.1987 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
22.05.1987 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
23.02.1987 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 42
18.06.1986 Claims Appeal 6
18.06.1986 Description Appeal 23
18.06.1986 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.06.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 3
14.02.1986 Description Appeal 3
14.02.1986 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.12.1985 Claims Appeal 6
20.12.1985 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
06.12.1985 Claims Appeal 6
06.12.1985 Description Appeal 27
06.12.1985 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
09.10.1985 Communication (no form) Appeal 3
08.10.1985 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.10.1985 Extension of time limit refused Search / examination 1
04.10.1985 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
01.10.1985 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.08.1985 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
02.08.1985 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
18.02.1985 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.02.1985 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 21
10.12.1984 Communication (no form) Appeal 7
30.05.1984 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 1
24.05.1984 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
24.05.1984 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
14.04.1984 Claims Search / examination 7
14.04.1984 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
28.01.1984 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.12.1983 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
09.12.1983 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 22
09.12.1983 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 3
27.08.1983 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
29.07.1983 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
29.07.1983 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
25.03.1983 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
24.01.1983 Claims Search / examination 7
24.01.1983 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
19.10.1982 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
30.09.1982 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
27.08.1982 Claims Search / examination 7
27.08.1982 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
27.07.1982 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.07.1982 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.07.1982 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.03.1982 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
14.02.1982 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 3
12.02.1981 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
09.09.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
09.07.1980 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
21.05.1980 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.05.1980 European search report Search / examination 2
04.03.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
03.03.1980 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.03.1980 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.1980 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.02.1980 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
08.02.1980 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
08.02.1980 Claims Search / examination 7
08.02.1980 Description Search / examination 26
08.02.1980 Drawings Search / examination 11
08.02.1980 Priority document Search / examination 35
08.02.1980 Priority document Search / examination 24
08.02.1980 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 3