Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0021366

EP0021366 - Spatial distortion correction method and apparatus for scintillation cameras [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.1985
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.09.1985 [1985/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/01]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stoub, Everett
718 West Terrace
Villa Park, Illinois 60181 / US
02 / Colshev, James
525 Midland Avenue
Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US
03 / Muellehner, Gerd
404 Oak Street
Wayne, Pennsylvania / US
[1981/01]
Application number, filing date80103460.420.06.1980
[1981/01]
Priority number, dateUS1979005117622.06.1979         Original published format: US 51176
[1981/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0021366
Date:07.01.1981
Language:EN
[1981/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0021366
Date:26.09.1984
Language:DE
[1984/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.1980
ClassificationInternational:G01T1/164
[1981/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1981/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Korrigieren der örtlichen Verzerrung in Szintillationskameras[1981/01]
English:Spatial distortion correction method and apparatus for scintillation cameras[1981/01]
French:Procédé et dispositif de correction de la distorsion spatiale pour caméras à scintillation[1981/01]
Examination procedure28.01.1981Examination requested  [1981/15]
17.11.1981Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.07.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
16.01.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.1984Fee for grant paid
08.02.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.06.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.1984Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:SearchFR2412856  [ ];
 US3745345  [ ];
 EP0002540  [ ]
    [ ] - JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, Vol. 13, No. 5, May 1972, pages 307-312 New York, U.S.A. S.S. SPECTOR et al.: "Analysis and correction of spatial distortions produced by the gamma camera" * Page 307, right-hand column *
    [ ] - JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, Vol. 19, No. 6, June 1978, page 746 New York, U.S.A. G.F. KNOLL et al.: "Real-time correction of radioistope camera signals for nonuniformity and nonlinearity" * Full article *
    [ ] - JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, Vol. 20, No. 6, June 1979, page 608 New York, U.S.A. E.W. STOUB et al.: "A spatial distortion correction method for gamma cameras" * Full article *