blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0027543

EP0027543 - Method and apparatus for continuously manufacturing single or plural layer reinforced webs of thermo-setting plastics [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  25.11.1987
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For:CH  FR  IT  LI  SE  AT 
CHEMIE LINZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
St. Peter-Strasse 25
A-4020 Linz / AT
For:DE 
Lentia Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Arabellastrasse 4 Postfach 81 05 08
D-8000 München 81 / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/17]For:CH  FR  IT  LI  SE  AT 
CHEMIE LINZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
St. Peter-Strasse 25
A-4020 Linz / AT
For:DE 
Lentia Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Arabellastrasse 4 Postfach 81 05 08
D-8000 München 81 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schnell, Peter
Schulstrasse 17
A-6060 Absam / AT
02 / Bihlmayer, Gustav, Dr.
St. Ulrich 93
A-4400 Steyr / AT
03 / Daume, Dietrich
Franckstrasse 23a
A-4020 Linz / AT
[1981/17]
Application number, filing date80105460.212.09.1980
[1981/17]
Priority number, dateDE1979294241319.10.1979         Original published format: DE 2942413
[1981/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0027543
Date:29.04.1981
Language:DE
[1981/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0027543
Date:18.05.1983
Language:DE
[1983/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.1981
ClassificationIPC:B32B17/04, B29D3/02
[1981/17]
CPC:
B32B38/08 (EP,US); B29B15/122 (EP,US); B29C70/088 (EP,US);
B29C70/504 (EP,US); B32B37/1027 (EP,US); B32B38/1808 (EP,US);
B29C33/68 (EP,US); B29K2055/02 (EP,US); B29K2105/0854 (EP,US);
B32B2260/046 (US); B32B2309/06 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI,   SE [1981/17]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur kontinuierlichen Herstellung von ein- oder mehrschichtigen, verstärkten Bahnen aus wärmehärtbarem Kunststoff[1981/17]
English:Method and apparatus for continuously manufacturing single or plural layer reinforced webs of thermo-setting plastics[1981/17]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication en continu de bandes renforcées en une ou plusieurs couches en matière plastique thermodurcissable[1981/17]
Examination procedure12.09.1980Examination requested  [1981/17]
17.03.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.1982Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
19.10.1982Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.1982Fee for grant paid
12.11.1982Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.02.1984  13.03.1984  ADMISSIBLE
Sandvik Process Systems GmbH
Salierstrasse 35
D-70736 Fellbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelm, Hans-Herbert, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1984/18]
Opponent(s)01  17.02.1984  13.03.1984  ADMISSIBLE
Sandvik Process Systems GmbH
Salierstrasse 35
D-70736 Fellbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Wilhelm, Hans-Herbert, Dr.-Ing., et al, et al
Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte Hospitalstrasse 8
D-70174 Stuttgart / DE
26.03.1984Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.06.1984Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.12.1984Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
12.02.1985Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
22.09.1987Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
22.11.1987Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/02]
Appeal following opposition24.09.1985Appeal received No.  T0242/85
22.09.1987Date of oral proceedings
24.09.1987Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [1989/25]CH18.05.1983
LI18.05.1983
Documents cited:SearchFR1324495  [ ] (SPECIALTY CONVERTERS);
 FR1558835  [ ];
 DE1945779  [ ] (IBUS WERKE GMBH);
 FR2155886  [ ] (REINKE FRITZ);
 FR2291859  [ ] (STAMICARBON [NL]);
 FR2360419  [ ] (BROCHIER IND [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.