blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0026869

EP0026869 - Device for the surveillance of the maintenance of an installation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1981/15]Signal transmitter, particularly warning device for the surveillance of installations
[1986/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.04.1987
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mobil Oil (Switzerland)
Picassoplatz 4
CH-4010 Basel / CH
[1981/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Knibiehler, Ernst
St. Johanns-Platz 18
CH-4056 Basel / CH
02 / Hirmann, Georg
Griesernweg 14
CH-8037 Zürich / CH
[1981/15]
Representative(s)Troesch, Hans Alfred, et al
Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Siewerdtstrasse 95
8050 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1986/23]Troesch, Hans Alfred, Dr. sc. techn., et al
Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Siewerdtstrasse 95
CH-8050 Zürich / CH
Former [1981/15]Troesch, Jacques J., Dr. sc. nat.
Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Siewerdtstrasse 95
CH-8050 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date80105689.622.09.1980
[1981/15]
Priority number, dateCH1979000891003.10.1979         Original published format: CH 891079
[1981/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0026869
Date:15.04.1981
Language:DE
[1981/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0026869
Date:04.06.1986
Language:DE
[1986/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.1980
ClassificationIPC:F16N29/04, G07C3/02
[1981/15]
CPC:
F16N29/04 (EP,US); G07C3/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1981/15]
TitleGerman:Wartungs-Überwachungseinrichtung für eine Anlage[1986/23]
English:Device for the surveillance of the maintenance of an installation[1986/23]
French:Equipement pour la surveillance de l'entretien d'une installation[1986/23]
Former [1981/15]Signalgeber, insbesondere Warnvorrichtung für die Wartung von Einrichtungen
Former [1981/15]Signal transmitter, particularly warning device for the surveillance of installations
Former [1981/15]Dispositif de signalisation, en particulier dispositif d'alarme pour l'entretien d'installations
Examination procedure03.10.1981Examination requested  [1981/50]
12.07.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
28.05.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
27.09.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.1985Fee for grant paid
25.11.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.08.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.1984Renewal fee patent year 05
01.07.1985Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE30.09.1986
LU30.09.1986
[1999/52]
Former [1991/51]BE30.09.1986
Documents cited:SearchUS3290669  [ ] (GUNTER MEWS);
 US3558924  [ ] (LINDELL EDWARD)
    [ ] - ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, Vol. 48, Nr. 583, September 1976, London GB, W. CHUNG: "Multiphase one shot provides pulses", Seite 21
    [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 20, Nr. 12, Mai 1978, New York US, H. HIGUCHI: "Electronic sequencer with programmable time delays" Seiten 5323-5324
    [ ] - THE ELECTRONIC ENGINEER, Vol. 28 Nr. 8, August 1969, 1969 Raduor US, M. STRANGE: "Op amps give mutuallyexclusive digital sequencing" Seite 80
ExaminationUS3546693
 US3603880
 US3938128
    - Handbuch für elektrisches Messen mechanischer Grössen, C. Rohrbach, VDI-Verlag, Düsseldorf, Seiten 431-437
    - "ELEKTROTECHNIK", 1976, Seiten 20-22
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.