blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0026911

EP0026911 - Biaxially stretched polypropylene sheet with preferential orientation, and process for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.1985
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.05.1985 [1985/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1981/15]For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshii, Toshiya
2-6-19 Seiran
Otsu / JP
02 / Tsunashima, Kenjii
1-22 Daigokamihayamacho
Fushimi-ku Kyoto / JP
03 / Sumiya, Takashi
43-1 Shogoinrengezocho
Sakyo-ku Kyoto / JP
[1981/15]
Representative(s)Wettlauffer, Willy, et al
Kalle Niederlassung der Hoechst AG Rheingaustrasse 190 Postfach 3540
D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/15]Wettlauffer, Willy, Dr., et al
Kalle Niederlassung der Hoechst AG Rheingaustrasse 190 Postfach 3540
D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE
Application number, filing date80105913.030.09.1980
[1981/15]
Priority number, dateJP1979012785405.10.1979         Original published format: JP 12785479
[1981/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0026911
Date:15.04.1981
Language:DE
[1981/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0026911
Date:09.05.1984
Language:DE
[1984/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.1981
ClassificationIPC:B29D7/24, C08J5/18
[1981/15]
CPC:
C08J5/18 (EP); B29C55/14 (EP); C08J2323/12 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1981/15]
TitleGerman:Biaxial gestreckte Polypropylenfolie mit Vorzugsorientierung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung[1981/15]
English:Biaxially stretched polypropylene sheet with preferential orientation, and process for its manufacture[1981/15]
French:Feuille de polypropylène biaxialement étirée avec orientation préférentielle et procédé pour sa fabrication[1981/15]
Examination procedure02.05.1981Examination requested  [1981/29]
18.03.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.08.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
14.10.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.1983Fee for grant paid
12.12.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.02.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1985/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2041913  [ ];
 DE1252894  [ ];
 CH371587  [ ];
 GB917903  [ ];
 DE1504697  [ ];
 DE1504523  [ ];
 DE1504023  [ ];
 DE1504608  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.