blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0029578

EP0029578 - Ultrasonic scanning module [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  19.12.1984
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
New York Institute of Technology
Wheatley Road
Old Westbury, New York 11568 / US
[N/P]
Former [1981/22]For all designated states
NEW YORK INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
Wheatley Road
Old Westbury, New York 11568 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Glenn, William E., Dr.
650 Royal Plaza
Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33301 / US
[1981/22]
Representative(s)Schütz, Peter, et al
v. Bezold & Sozien Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/12]Schütz, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Dr. Dieter von Bezold Dipl.-Ing. Peter Schütz Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Heusler Brienner Strasse 52
D-80333 München / DE
Former [1981/22]Daum, Martin, Dr.
Boehringer Mannheim GmbH Postfach 31 01 20
D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE
Application number, filing date80107177.019.11.1980
[1981/22]
Priority number, dateUS1979009632221.11.1979         Original published format: US 96322
[1981/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0029578
Date:03.06.1981
Language:EN
[1981/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.1981
ClassificationIPC:A61B10/00, G10K11/30
[1981/22]
CPC:
A61B8/00 (EP,US); G10K11/30 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1981/22]
TitleGerman:Ultraschallabtastmodul[1981/22]
English:Ultrasonic scanning module[1981/22]
French:Module à balayage par ultrasons[1981/22]
File destroyed:14.07.1990
Examination procedure28.10.1981Examination requested  [1982/01]
16.03.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.1983Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
26.04.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.1984Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/08]
01.10.1984Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2911613  [ ] (NEW YORK INST TECHN);
 GB2017302  [ ] (NEW YORK INST TECHN);
 US3927557  [ ] (VIERTL JOHN R M);
 US3800276  [ ] (RISHELL G)
    [ ] - NACHRICHTENTECHNIK, Vol. 18, No. 10, October 1968 VEB Verlag Technik Berlin (DE) M.V. ARDENNE et al.: "Ultraschall Focoscan-Anlage zur Aufnahme von A-,B-,C- und 3D-Bildern in der medizinischen Ultraschall Diagnostik" pages 361-368 * Page 361, left-hand column, line 1 to page 361, right-hand column, line 13; figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.