Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0030386

EP0030386 - Construction element for doors, gates or the like and process for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.10.1981
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hörmann KG Brockhagen
Horststrasse 17
33803 Steinhagen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/24]For all designated states
Hörmann KG Brockhagen
Horststrasse 17
D-33803 Steinhagen-Brockhagen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hörmann, Michael, Dipl.-Ing.
Upheider Weg
D-4803 Steinhagen / DE
[1981/24]
Representative(s)Flügel, Otto , et al
Lesser, Flügel & Säger Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 56 Postfach 81 05 40
D-8000 München 80 / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/24]Flügel, Otto, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Lesser, Flügel & Säger Patentanwälte Richard-Strauss-Strasse 56 Postfach 81 05 40
D-8000 München 80 / DE
Application number, filing date80107688.606.12.1980
[1981/24]
Priority number, dateDE19790034411U06.12.1979         Original published format: DE 7934411 U
[1981/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0030386
Date:17.06.1981
Language:DE
[1981/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.1981
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/70, E04C2/38
[1981/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1981/24]
TitleGerman:Bauelement für Türen, Tore od. dgl. sowie Herstellungsverfahren für dasselbe[1981/24]
English:Construction element for doors, gates or the like and process for its production[1981/24]
French:Elément pour portes, portails ou analogues et procédé pour sa fabrication[1981/24]
File destroyed:12.02.1989
Examination procedure06.04.1981Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, GB, LU
22.05.1981Application withdrawn by applicant  [1981/49]
16.06.1981Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.01.1981CH   M02   Not yet paid
06.01.1981GB   M02   Not yet paid
06.01.1981LU   M02   Not yet paid
Documents cited:SearchDE1965393U  [ ];
 FR2317463  [ ];
 US3267626  [ ];
 US4037377  [ ];
 FR2292085  [ ]