blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0022293

EP0022293 - Tube joint to be screwed into a conduit or into an apparatus for creating a closed circulation circuit of a pressurized fluid, and method for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  26.06.1985
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baumgartner, Merzia
Wiesenstrasse 23
CH-5605 Dottikon (Kanton Aargau) / CH
[1981/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Andreolla, Florian
Wiesenstrasse 23
CH-5605 Dottikon (Kanton Aargau) / CH
[1981/02]
Representative(s)Bovard, Fritz Albert, et al
Bovard & Cie Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16
CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH
[1981/02]
Application number, filing date80200618.928.06.1980
[1981/02]
Priority number, dateCH1979000632006.07.1979         Original published format: CH 632079
[1981/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0022293
Date:14.01.1981
Language:DE
[1981/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0022293
Date:02.03.1983
Language:DE
[1983/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.1980
ClassificationIPC:F16L15/04, B23B5/36
[1981/02]
CPC:
F16L15/008 (EP,US); F16L41/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1981/02]
TitleGerman:Verbindungselement zum Einschrauben in eine Leitung oder in einen Apparat zur Herstellung eines geschlossenen Druckmedium-Umlaufkreises und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[1981/02]
English:Tube joint to be screwed into a conduit or into an apparatus for creating a closed circulation circuit of a pressurized fluid, and method for making same[1981/02]
French:Raccord de tuyau pour le vissage dans une conduite ou dans un appareil pour la réalisation d'un circuit de circulation d'un médium sous pression et procédé pour sa fabrication[1981/02]
Examination procedure19.03.1981Examination requested  [1981/22]
06.07.1982Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
03.08.1982Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.1982Fee for grant paid
28.10.1982Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.11.1983  19.01.1984  ADMISSIBLE
Eisele Pneumatik GmbH
Hermann-Heese-Strasse 14
D-7050 Waiblingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte
Lange Strasse 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1984/06]
Opponent(s)01  29.11.1983  19.01.1984  ADMISSIBLE
Eisele Pneumatik GmbH
Hermann-Heese-Strasse 14
D-7050 Waiblingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bartels, Held und Partner
Lange Strasse 51
D-70174 Stuttgart / DE
20.01.1984Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.05.1984Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.01.1985Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
28.01.1985Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1985/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.198203   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.1982
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU30.06.1983
[1999/52]
Documents cited:SearchDE7230680U  [ ];
 US1368196  [ ] (PECK HARRY F);
 US3499670  [ ] (WOODY CHARLES M DE);
 US3719202  [ ] (FITZPATRICK J);
 DE2217288  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.