Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0017381

EP0017381 - Monoclonal antibody to human T cells, method for preparing it, hybrid cell line producing it, therapeutic composition comprising it and diagnostic method using it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  11.07.1991
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ORTHO PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION
U.S. Route 202 P.O. Box 300 Raritan
New Jersey 08869-0602 / US
[N/P]
Former [1980/21]For all designated states
ORTHO PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION
U.S. Route 202 P.O. Box 300
Raritan New Jersey 08869-0602 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kung, Patrick Chung-Shu
1096 Rector Road
Bridgewater New Jersey / US
02 / Goldstein, Gideon
30 Dorison Drive
Short Hills New Jersey / US
[1980/21]
Representative(s)Jones, Alan John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1980/21]Jones, Alan John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date80300829.119.03.1980
[1980/21]
Priority number, dateUS1979002213220.03.1979         Original published format: US 22132
[1980/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0017381
Date:15.10.1980
Language:EN
[1980/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0017381
Date:07.01.1981
Language:EN
[1981/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0017381
Date:10.07.1985
Language:EN
[1985/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.1980
ClassificationInternational:C12P1/00, C12N5/00, C12N15/00, A61K39/395, G01N33/50, // C12R1/91
[1985/28]
Former International [1980/21]C12P1/00, C12N5/00, C12N15/00, A61K39/395, G01N33/54, // C12R1/91
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1980/21]
TitleGerman:Monoklonaler Antikörper gegen menschliche T-Zellen, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung, ihn produzierende Hybridzellinie, ihn enthaltende therapeutische Zusammensetzung und ihn verwendendes diagnostisches Verfahren[1980/21]
English:Monoclonal antibody to human T cells, method for preparing it, hybrid cell line producing it, therapeutic composition comprising it and diagnostic method using it[1980/21]
French:Anticorps monoclônal contre les cellules T humaines, procédé pour sa préparation, lignée cellulaire hybride le produisant, composition thérapeutique le contenant et méthode de diagnostic l'utilisant[1980/21]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure16.06.1981Examination requested  [1981/36]
24.11.1981Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.1984Fee for grant paid
15.08.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.04.1986  30.04.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Behringwerke Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 11 40
D-35001 Marburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  07.04.1986  30.04.1986  ADMISSIBLE
SANDOZ AG Patent- und Markenabteilung
Lichtstrasse 35
CH-4002 Basel / CH
 03  08.04.1986  30.04.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Becton, Dickinson and Company
Mack Centre Drive
Paramus, New Jersey 07652 / US
Opponent's representative
Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
 04  10.04.1986  16.07.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Mannheim GmbH Patentabteilung
Sandhofer Strasse 116
D-68298 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Weickmann, Heinrich
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1989/52]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.1986  30.04.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Behringwerke Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 11 40
D-35001 Marburg / DE
Opponent's representative
VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
D-81634 München / DE
 02  07.04.1986  30.04.1986  ADMISSIBLE
SANDOZ AG Patent- und Markenabteilung
Lichtstrasse 35
CH-4002 Basel / CH
 03  08.04.1986  30.04.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Becton, Dickinson and Company
Mack Centre Drive
Paramus, New Jersey 07652 / US
Opponent's representative
Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
 04  10.04.1986  16.07.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Mannheim GmbH Patentabteilung
Sandhofer Strasse 116
D-68298 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
D-81635 München / DE
Former [1986/24]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.1986   
Behringwerke Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 11 40
D-35001 Marburg / DE
 02  07.04.1986   
SANDOZ AG Patent- und Markenabteilung
Lichtstrasse 35
CH-4002 Basel / CH
 03  08.04.1986   
Becton, Dickinson and Company
Mack Centre Drive
Paramus, New Jersey 07652 / US
Opponent's representative
Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
 04  10.04.1986   
Boehringer Mannheim GmbH Patentabteilung
Sandhofer Strasse 116
D-68298 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
D-81635 München / DE
Former [1986/23]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.1986   
Behringwerke Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 11 40
D-35001 Marburg / DE
 02  07.04.1986   
SANDOZ AG Patent- und Markenabteilung
Lichtstrasse 35
CH-4002 Basel / CH
11.08.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.10.1987Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.07.1988Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.1989Reply to a communication from the opposition division
07.06.1989Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.01.1991Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
10.07.1991Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/35]
Appeal following opposition21.06.1989Appeal received No.  T0418/89
17.10.1989Statement of grounds filed
08.01.1991Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
08.01.1991Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.1984Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.1985Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [1992/05]CH10.07.1985
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - NATURE, Vol. 273, 22nd June 1978, pages 666-668 M.M. TRUCCO et al.: "Monoclonal antibodies against human lymphocyte antigens" * Full article *
    [ ] - NATURE, Vol. 256, 7th August 1975, pages 495-497 G. KOHLER et al.: "Continuous cultures of fused cells secreting antibody of predefined specificity" * Full article *
    [ ] - CHEMICAL & ENGINEERING NEWS, Vol. 57, No. 1, 1st January 1979 pages 15-17 J.L. FOX: "Antibody reagents revolutionizing immunology" * Full article *
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 89, No. 15, 9th October 1978, page 435, No. 127545z Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. I.S. TROWBRIDGE: "Interspecies spleen-myeloma hybrid producing monoclonal antibodies against mouse lymphocyte surface glyco-protein, T200." & J. EXP. MED. 1978, 148(1), 313-23 * Abstract *
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 88, No. 3, 16th January 1978, page 432, No. 20373u Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. A.F. WILLIAMS et al.: "Analysis of cell surfaces by xenogeneic myeloma-hybrid antibodies: differentation antigens of rat lymphocytes" & CELL (CAMBRIDGE, MASS.) 1977, 12(3), 663-73 * Abstract *
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 90, No. 1, 1st January 1979, page 412, No. 4241k Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. G.J. HAEMMERLING et al.: "Monoclonal antibodies against murine cell surface antigens: anti-H-2, anti-Ia and anti-T cell antibodies" & CURR. TOP. MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL. 1978, 81(Lymphocyte Hybridomas), 100-6 * Abstract *
    [ ] - UNLISTED DRUGS, Vol. 32, No. 5, May 1980, page 65 & FED. PROC,, 39, 3463 Abs, 1st March 1980 * Left-hand column, point c, reference MT-1 *