Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0017381 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0017381



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1259
13.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
13.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
11.07.1991 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
10.07.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.07.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.07.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.07.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.07.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.01.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.01.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.01.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.01.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.01.1991 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.01.1991 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
08.01.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 21
08.01.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 21
08.01.1991 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
28.12.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.12.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
12.12.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.12.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.12.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
04.12.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.11.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
27.11.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
27.11.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
27.11.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
27.11.1990 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
04.10.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
04.10.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.10.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.09.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
25.09.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.09.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.09.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.09.1990 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
19.09.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.09.1990 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.09.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.09.1990 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.09.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.09.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
17.09.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
17.09.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
17.09.1990 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
13.09.1990 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.09.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 11
11.09.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.09.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.09.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.09.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.09.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.09.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
18.07.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.07.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.07.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.07.1990 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.07.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 42
18.05.1990 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
10.05.1990 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
16.03.1990 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.03.1990 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
22.12.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.12.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.12.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.12.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.12.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
29.11.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.11.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.11.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.11.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
29.11.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.11.1989 Drawings Appeal 2
29.11.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.11.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
13.11.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
07.11.1989 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.11.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.11.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.11.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.11.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.10.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.10.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
17.10.1989 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.10.1989 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
17.10.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 33
16.10.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 29
11.10.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.10.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.10.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.10.1989 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.09.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.09.1989 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.09.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
04.08.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
17.07.1989 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.07.1989 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
13.07.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.06.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
14.06.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.06.1989 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
12.06.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.06.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.06.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.06.1989 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
07.06.1989 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 16
07.06.1989 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 21
07.06.1989 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
07.06.1989 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.1989 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.1989 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.1989 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.1989 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.1989 Means of redress Opposition 1
27.04.1989 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
27.04.1989 Annex to a communication Opposition 16
27.04.1989 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
27.04.1989 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 2
27.04.1989 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
27.04.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.1989 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.04.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.04.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
06.04.1989 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.03.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
31.03.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.03.1989 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.03.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.02.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
13.01.1989 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
13.01.1989 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 25
29.12.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
23.12.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.12.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.12.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.12.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.12.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.12.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.12.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.12.1988 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.12.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.12.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.12.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
09.12.1988 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.12.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.12.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.12.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.12.1988 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.12.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
16.11.1988 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.10.1988 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
26.10.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.10.1988 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.10.1988 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.10.1988 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
10.10.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
05.10.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
05.10.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
05.10.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
05.10.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
05.10.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
05.10.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
29.09.1988 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.1988 N/A Opposition 1
23.09.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
20.09.1988 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
20.09.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
01.08.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
25.07.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.07.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
09.07.1988 N/A Opposition 1
07.07.1988 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.05.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
11.05.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.05.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.04.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.04.1988 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.03.1988 Annex to the communication Opposition 41
30.03.1988 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
04.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.02.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.01.1988 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.11.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.11.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.11.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.11.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.11.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
13.11.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.10.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
01.10.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
01.10.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
01.10.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
01.10.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.09.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.09.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
31.07.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.07.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.07.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.07.1987 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.06.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 46
30.06.1987 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.06.1987 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 46
10.06.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
04.06.1987 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.05.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
20.05.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.05.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
27.04.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
27.04.1987 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.04.1987 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
02.03.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
02.03.1987 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
03.10.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.10.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.10.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.10.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.10.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
06.09.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
27.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.08.1986 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.08.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.08.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.08.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.08.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.08.1986 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.08.1986 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
30.07.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
25.07.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.07.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
16.07.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
11.07.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.07.1986 N/A Opposition 1
09.07.1986 N/A Opposition 1
09.07.1986 N/A Opposition 1
19.06.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.05.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.05.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
23.05.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.05.1986 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
25.04.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.04.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
23.04.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
23.04.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
23.04.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
23.04.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
23.04.1986 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.04.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.04.1986 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.04.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
09.04.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
09.04.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
08.04.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 35
07.04.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.04.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
07.04.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
07.04.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.04.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
07.04.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
05.04.1986 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
05.04.1986 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
16.07.1985 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.05.1985 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.03.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
27.02.1985 General enquiry Search / examination 1
05.10.1984 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.10.1984 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
05.10.1984 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
25.07.1984 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 38
20.06.1984 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.06.1984 Description Search / examination 3
18.06.1984 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.04.1984 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.04.1984 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
23.03.1984 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
07.11.1983 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
02.11.1983 Claims Search / examination 3
02.11.1983 Description Search / examination 3
02.11.1983 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.09.1983 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 6
11.08.1983 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.07.1983 Annex Search / examination 1
08.07.1983 Annex Search / examination 2
08.07.1983 Annex Search / examination 1
08.07.1983 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
27.06.1983 Annex Search / examination 1
27.06.1983 Annex Search / examination 1
27.06.1983 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
13.12.1982 Claims Search / examination 4
13.12.1982 Description Search / examination 3
13.12.1982 Letter concerning biological material Search / examination 2
13.12.1982 Letter concerning biological material Search / examination 2
13.12.1982 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
01.09.1982 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
13.03.1982 Claims Search / examination 9
13.03.1982 Description Search / examination 4
13.03.1982 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.02.1982 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.11.1981 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.06.1981 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
19.01.1981 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
23.10.1980 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.10.1980 European search report Search / examination 2
21.10.1980 Invitation to pay administrative fee for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
21.08.1980 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.05.1980 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.05.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
19.03.1980 Abstract Search / examination 2
19.03.1980 Claims Search / examination 7
19.03.1980 Description Search / examination 26
19.03.1980 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.03.1980 Drawings Search / examination 4
19.03.1980 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.03.1980 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
19.03.1980 Priority document Search / examination 39
19.03.1980 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6