blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0018135

EP0018135 - Xanthine derivatives, a process for their preparation and their use in pharmaceutical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  02.02.1993
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BEECHAM - WUELFING GmbH & Co. KG
Stresemannallee 6
D-41460 Neuss / DE
[1981/27]
Former [1980/22]For all designated states
Johann A. Wuelfing
Stresemannallee 6
D-4040 Neuss / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Goring, Joachim Ewald
Sauerweinstrasse 25
D-3212 Gronau (Leine) / DE
[1980/22]
Representative(s)Russell, Brian John, et al
SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1982/18]Russell, Brian John, et al
SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB
Former [1980/22]Dawson, Hugh Bainforde
Glaxo Wellcome plc Glaxo House Berkeley Avenue
Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
Application number, filing date80301052.902.04.1980
[1980/22]
Priority number, dateGB1979001205005.04.1979         Original published format: GB 7912050
[1980/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0018135
Date:29.10.1980
Language:EN
[1980/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0018135
Date:28.09.1983
Language:EN
[1983/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.08.1980
ClassificationIPC:C07D473/06, A61K31/52
[1980/22]
CPC:
C07D473/06 (EP,US); A61P9/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1983/14]
Former [1980/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Xanthin-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung in pharmazeutischen Zusammensetzungen[1980/22]
English:Xanthine derivatives, a process for their preparation and their use in pharmaceutical compositions[1980/22]
French:Dérivés de xanthine, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation dans des compositions pharmaceutiques[1980/22]
Examination procedure10.03.1981Examination requested  [1981/21]
14.12.1981Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.1982Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
28.02.1983Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.1983Fee for grant paid
28.03.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.06.1984  29.07.1984  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1984/36]
Opponent(s)01  27.06.1984  29.07.1984  ADMISSIBLE
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
31.07.1984Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.12.1984Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.03.1985Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
10.06.1987Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.1987Reply to a communication from the opposition division
23.05.1990Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.12.1991Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.10.1992Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
16.10.1992Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/12]
Appeal following opposition14.02.1990Appeal received No.  T0116/90
14.03.1990Statement of grounds filed
05.09.1990Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M01) [1990/36]
18.12.1991Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
18.12.1991Date of oral proceedings
30.12.1991Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE03.04.1987
GB02.04.1992
BE30.04.1992
[2015/21]
Former [1993/46]SE03.04.1987
GB02.04.1992
BE30.04.1992
CH30.04.1992
LI30.04.1992
Former [1993/16]SE03.04.1987
BE30.04.1992
CH30.04.1992
LI30.04.1992
Former [1993/13]SE03.04.1987
CH30.04.1992
LI30.04.1992
Former [1989/18]SE03.04.1987
Documents cited:SearchDE1212542  [ ] (CHEMIEWERK HOMBURG, et al);
 FR1523273  [ ] (SOC IND FAB ANTIBIOTIQUES SIFA);
 DE2827497  [ ] (ABC IST BIOLOG CHEM SPA)
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS Vol. 57, No. 13, 24 December 1962 Columbus, Ohio, USA U. AVICO et al. "1,3-Dioxolanes and 1,3-dioxanes derivatives" column 16605, Abstract a to f & Farmaco (Pavia) Ed. Sci., Vol. 17, 1962, pages 73 to 80.
ExaminationAT186250B
 GB759981
 FR7390M
 EP0005015
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.