blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0018154

EP0018154 - Vibrio cholerae mutants, vaccine comprising them, method for preparing a subunit therefrom and composition comprising it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1980/22]Vibrio cholerae mutant, vaccine comprising it, method for preparing a subunit therefrom and composition comprising it
[1985/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.07.1986
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.1986No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.1986 [1986/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE BOARD OF REGENTS, THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
201 West 7th Street
Austin, Texas 78701 / US
[N/P]
Former [1980/22]For all designated states
BOARD OF REGENTS THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
201 West 7th Street
Austin, Texas 78701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Honda, Takeshi
Nishichujo Cho
Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP
02 / Finkelstein, Richard A.
3207 Honeysucke Drive
Columbia Missouri, 65201 / US
[1980/22]
Representative(s)Spencer, Graham Easdale, et al
A.A. Thornton & CO Northumberland House 303-306, High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[1980/22]
Application number, filing date80301116.208.04.1980
[1980/22]
Priority number, dateUS1979002909211.04.1979         Original published format: US 29092
[1980/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0018154
Date:29.10.1980
Language:EN
[1980/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0018154
Date:27.05.1981
Language:EN
[1981/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0018154
Date:04.09.1985
Language:EN
[1985/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.1981
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/00, A61K39/106
[1980/22]
CPC:
A61K39/107 (EP,US); C12N1/205 (EP,US); C12N15/01 (EP,US);
A61K2039/522 (EP,US); C12R2001/63 (EP,US); Y02A50/30 (EP,US);
Y10S435/909 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1980/22]
TitleGerman:Choleravibriomutanten, sie enthaltender Impfstoff, Verfahren zur Herstellung eines ihrer Bausteine und ihn enthaltende Zusammensetzung[1985/36]
English:Vibrio cholerae mutants, vaccine comprising them, method for preparing a subunit therefrom and composition comprising it[1985/36]
French:Mutants de Vibrio cholerae, vaccin les comprenant, procédé de préparation d'une de ses sous-unités et composition comprenant celle-ci[1985/36]
Former [1980/22]Choleravibriomutant, ihn enthaltender Impfstoff, Verfahren zur Herstellung eines seiner Bausteine und ihn enthaltende Zusammensetzung
Former [1980/22]Vibrio cholerae mutant, vaccine comprising it, method for preparing a subunit therefrom and composition comprising it
Former [1980/22]Mutant de Vibrio cholerae, vaccin le comprenant, procédé de préparation d'une de ses sous-unités et composition comprenant celle-ci
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure21.09.1981Examination requested  [1981/48]
19.07.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.11.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
03.10.1984Fee for grant paid
03.10.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.11.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)05.06.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.1984Renewal fee patent year 05
11.04.1985Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]  - NATURE, Vol. 230, No. 5289, 12th March 1971, pages 97-99 B.D. HOWARD: "A prototype live oral cholera vaccine"
 [XP]  - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, Vol. 76, No. 4, April 1979, pages 2052-2056 T. HONDA et al.: "Selection and characteristics of a vibrio cholerae mutant lacking the A (ADP-ri-bosylating) portion of the cholera enterotoxin"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.